JDH Unlimited Inc v. APKZ Medical Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JDH Unlimited Inc
Defendant: Jessica Rose Koehler, Western Med Supplies LLC, Check Shih Shen and APKZ Medical Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03118
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Jessica Rose Koehler. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. by JDH Unlimited Inc (Medinets, Dov)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to APKZ Medical Inc., Check Shih Shen, Western Med Supplies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued) (Tavarez, Jennifer)
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. by JDH Unlimited Inc (Medinets, Dov)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by JDH Unlimited Inc (Medinets, Dov)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by JDH Unlimited Inc (Medinets, Dov)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by JDH Unlimited Inc (Medinets, Dov)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by JDH Unlimited Inc (Medinets, Dov)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by JDH Unlimited Inc (Medinets, Dov)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14528831 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by JDH Unlimited Inc. (Medinets, Dov)
June 2, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 2, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit a completed Civil Cover Sheet answering ALL questions *** INCLUDING the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page***. Please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JDH Unlimited Inc v. APKZ Medical Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Rose Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Med Supplies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Check Shih Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APKZ Medical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JDH Unlimited Inc
Represented By: Dov Ber Medinets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?