Espinal et al v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: Joanna Espinal and Ramona De Leon
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv03404
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to respond, pursuant to the Court's individual rules (Rule III.A), to defendant's motion for a pre-motion conference #7 no later than July 16, 2021. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 7/7/2021. (Guo, Alicia)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Bojbasa, Michael)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by JetBlue Airways Corporation (Bojbasa, Michael)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JetBlue Airways Corporation (Bojbasa, Michael)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JetBlue Airways Corporation (Bojbasa, Michael)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JetBlue Airways Corporation from Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 707325/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14571915) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons with Notice and Notice of Appearance with Demand for a VBOP, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Summons with Notice) (Bojbasa, Michael)
June 16, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 16, 2021 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinal et al v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Espinal
Represented By: Nestor Rosado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona De Leon
Represented By: Nestor Rosado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Michael Bojbasa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?