Allstate Insurance Company et al v All Best Trading Inc.
Plaintiff: Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: John Does 1 Through 5, All Best Trading Inc, Antonina Kutsareva and ABC Corporations 1 through 5
Case Number: 1:2021cv03519
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Complaint due by 9/13/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/9/2021. (Bayer, Sarah)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Complaint against Defendants All Best Trading, Inc. and Antonina Kutsareva by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company. (Pinzow, Lee)
July 12, 2021 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Complaint due by 8/12/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/12/2021. (Bayer, Sarah)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Complaint against Defendants All Best Trading, Inc. and Antonina Kutsareva by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Pinzow, Lee)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER directing The Clerk is requested to (a) terminate all defendants in this action except Quality Med Equip Inc., Anzhelika Dzhurayeva, John Does 1 through 5, and ABC Corporations 1 through 5; (b) open separate index numbers for each of the group of plaintiffs and defendants listed as Groups 2 through 26 in the Group A Schedule annexed to plaintiffs' response (the new cases) ; (c) file this Order as the initial filing in each of the new cases; and (d) have each new case randomly assigned to a District Judge and Magistrate Judge. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Schedeule A) (Marziliano, August)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v All Best Trading Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Scott Marvin
Represented By: James A McKenney
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Scott Marvin
Represented By: James A McKenney
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Scott Marvin
Represented By: James A McKenney
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Daniel Scott Marvin
Represented By: James A McKenney
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 Through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Best Trading Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonina Kutsareva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?