Deering v. Assing et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Deering
Defendant: Herman Lai, Kristel Johnson, Tanya Kinsella, Krystin Suarez, Besemah Rogers, Richard Assing, Peter Borisenko, Maggie Clamp, City of New York and New York City Police Department
Case Number: 1:2021cv03601
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Kristel Johnson. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
July 30, 2021 Filing 19 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Ryan Deering (Bellovin, Marshall)
July 12, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Tanya Kinsella. (Galeano, Sonia)
July 12, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Richard Assing. (Galeano, Sonia)
July 12, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Herman Lai. (Galeano, Sonia)
July 12, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Besemah Rogers. (Galeano, Sonia)
July 12, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Peter Borisenko. (Galeano, Sonia)
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Maggie Clamp. (Galeano, Sonia)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Krystin Suarez. (Galeano, Sonia)
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Ryan Deering (Bellovin, Marshall)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Ryan Deering (Bellovin, Marshall)
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Ryan Deering (Bellovin, Marshall)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Ryan Deering (Bellovin, Marshall)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Ryan Deering (Bellovin, Marshall)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Ryan Deering (Bellovin, Marshall)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Ryan Deering (Bellovin, Marshall)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 26, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Ryan Deering (Bellovin, Marshall)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Assing, Peter Borisenko, Maggie Clamp, Kristel Johnson, Tanya Kinsella, Herman Lai, Besemah Rogers, Krystin Suarez filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14602468 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Ryan Deering. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Notice of Right to Sue) (Bellovin, Marshall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deering v. Assing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Kinsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krystin Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Besemah Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Assing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Borisenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Clamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Deering
Represented By: Marshall B. Bellovin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?