Alishaev Brothers AY Inc. v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Alishaev Brothers AY Inc.
Defendant: Neil Cohen, United States Customs and Border Protection, Unnamed Agents of United States Customs and Border Protection and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv03632
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States of America (Eichenholtz, Seth)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The #12 Stipulation of Dismissal is So Ordered. A Clerk's Judgment need not and shall not be issued. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/7/2021. (Nguyen, Andrew)
July 3, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel having informed this Court's deputy that the scheduled conference previously set for 6/29/2021 could be adjourned, the Court did not hold a conference. The parties are directed to file a joint letter on 7/8/2021 informing the Court of the status of the case and, if necessary, at least three agreeable days for a conference. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/3/2021. (Gonzalez, Fida)
June 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanisha R. Payne on behalf of United States Customs and Border Protection, United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Payne, Tanisha)
June 29, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Neil Cohen, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States of America, Unnamed Agents of United States Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Daniel Volpe on behalf of United States Customs and Border Protection, United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Volpe, Christopher)
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) .
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An Order to Show Cause Hearing will be held on 6/29/2021 at 4:45 p.m., in Courtroom 4F North. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 6/29/2021. (Gonzalez, Fida)
June 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Gail Kellman on behalf of Alishaev Brothers AY Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Kellman, Susan)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 DECLARATION re #4 Unsigned Order to Show Cause - Declaration of N. Elishaev in Support of OSC by Alishaev Brothers AY Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Shipment from South Africa, arrived May 10, 2021, #2 Exhibit B - Shipment from Indonesia, arrived May 25, 2021, #3 Exhibit C - Shipment from Indonesia, arrived June 8, 2021, #4 Exhibit D - Shipment from South Africa, arrived June 14, 2021, #5 Exhibit E - Shipment from Indonesia, arrived June 14, 2021, #6 Exhibit F - Historical price of gold for 2021, #7 Exhibit G - Communications with suppliers dated June 24, 2021, #8 Exhibit H - Communications with suppliers dated June 18, 2021, #9 Exhibit I - Emails from customers cancelling orders, #10 Exhibit J - Enquiries from Customers) (Frisch, Andrew)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Unsigned Order to Show Cause Seeking Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Alishaev Brothers AY Inc. (Frisch, Andrew)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jolene F. Lavigne-Albert on behalf of Alishaev Brothers AY Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Lavigne-Albert, Jolene)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew James Frisch on behalf of Alishaev Brothers AY Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Frisch, Andrew)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Neil Cohen, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States of America, Unnamed Agents of United States Customs and Border Protection filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14607016 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Alishaev Brothers AY Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - United States of America, #3 Summons - United States Customs and Border Protection, #4 Summons - N. Cohen, #5 Summons - Unnamed Agents of United States Customs and Border Protection) (Frisch, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alishaev Brothers AY Inc. v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Volpe
Represented By: Tanisha R. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Agents of United States Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Volpe
Represented By: Tanisha R. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alishaev Brothers AY Inc.
Represented By: Jolene F. Lavigne-Albert
Represented By: Andrew James Frisch
Represented By: Susan Gail Kellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?