Merl v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Zwia Merl
Defendant: Boro Park Obstetrics & Gynecology, United States of America and Dr. Pedram Bral
Case Number: 1:2021cv03665
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: James R Cho
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 Letter advising of plaintiff's death by Zwia Merl Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00105-CBA-JRC, 1:21-cv-03665-CBA-JRC (Adimey, Marijo)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 8/23/2021. (Gillespie, Saudia)
August 23, 2021 Minute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 8/23/2021 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Initial telephonic conference held in 21cv3665. Richard Soldano with Gair, Gair Conason appeared for plaintiff; AUSA Shana Priore appeared for the United States; and Karen Ryan appeared for defendants Dr. Pedram Bral and Boro Park Obstetrics & Gynecology. The Court entered the following discovery schedule: parties to exchange automatic disclosures by 9/3/2021; no amendment of the pleadings will be permitted after 11/1/2021; parties to complete fact discovery by 11/12/2021; expert disclosures due by 1/2/2022; rebuttal expert disclosures due by 1/31/2022; and all discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed by 2/12/2022. The parties shall file a Status Report by 10/12/2021. In the Status Report, the parties should indicate whether they would like a referral to Court-annexed mediation or a settlement conference. The parties shall coordinate discovery with 21cv105. (AT&T Conference Bridge.) (Gillespie, Saudia)
August 23, 2021 Case Consolidated with 1:21-cv-00105-CBA-JRC Merl v. The United States of America (Gillespie, Saudia)
August 23, 2021 Cases associated. (Gillespie, Saudia)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Scheduling Order by Zwia Merl (Adimey, Marijo)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Boro Park Obstetrics & Gynecology, Pedram Bral. (Villa, Suhlail)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic-Initial Conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on August 23, 2021 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel for defendants are directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with plaintiff's counsel. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than August 19, 2021. Each party is directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 1065334. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 7/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho for all further proceedings. Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall, Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/7/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America informing the Court of a related matter arising out of the same set of facts and laws, and respectfully requesting that the Court mark the cases as related and assign the newer case, Merl v. United States of America, No. CV-21-3665, to Judge Amon and Magistrate Judge Cho, who have been handling the older case, Merl v. United States of America, No. CV-21-105 (Priore, Shana)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Suhlail Christine Villa on behalf of Boro Park Obstetrics & Gynecology, Pedram Bral (aty to be noticed) (Villa, Suhlail)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by United States of America (Priore, Shana)
June 30, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 30, 2021 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 30, 2021 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Supreme Court of State of NY County of Kings, case number 507898/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Certification of Scope, #4 Letter to State Court re: removal, #5 Notice of Filing of Removal to State Court) (Priore, Shana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merl v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boro Park Obstetrics & Gynecology
Represented By: Suhlail Christine Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Shana C. Priore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Pedram Bral
Represented By: Suhlail Christine Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zwia Merl
Represented By: Marijo Camille Adimey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?