Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Epione Medical, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Emanuel David, Ruslan Nektalov, Epione Medical, P.C., APAK Chiropractic, P.C., Micahel Y. Jacobi, D.O., Aleksandr Mostovoy, D.C., Wellmart RX, Inc., Simon Davydov, Stella Raytsin, Elena Mumin-Akhunov, Practice Wiz, Inc., Innovative Business Strategies, Inc., Emanuel Davydov, Emik Davydov, Russ Nekta and MBCC Support Ltd. doing business as Billing Pros
Case Number: 1:2021cv03970
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Ruslan Nektalov served on 8/18/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
August 19, 2021 Filing 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by Simon Davydov, Ruslan Nektalov, Wellmart RX, Inc.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
August 19, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Bowers on behalf of Simon Davydov, Ruslan Nektalov, Wellmart RX, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bowers, Nicholas)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #28 #29 #30 #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Deadline for all defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to 10/1/2021; GRANTING IN PART #28 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Initial Status Conference is adjourned to 9/28/2021 at 9:30 AM. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 3970#, and are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements set forth at #9 including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/19/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 18, 2021 Filing 30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, to October 1, and proposed adjournment to Initial Status Conference to week after October 1 by Emanuel David, Innovative Business Strategies, Inc.. (Rubin, Aaron)
August 18, 2021 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer through September 10, 2021 by APAK Chiropractic, P.C., Aleksandr Mostovoy, D.C.. (Chiu, Wing)
August 18, 2021 Filing 28 Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference previously scheduled for August 26, 2021 (ECF #9), Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, until October 1, 2021 by Epione Medical, P.C., Micahel Y. Jacobi, D.O., MBCC Support Ltd., Elena Mumin-Akhunov, Stella Raytsin. (George, Abraham)
August 18, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Michael Rubin on behalf of Innovative Business Strategies, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Rubin, Aaron)
August 18, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Oleg A. Mestechkin on behalf of APAK Chiropractic, P.C., Aleksandr Mostovoy, D.C. (aty to be noticed) (Mestechkin, Oleg)
August 18, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Wing K. Chiu on behalf of APAK Chiropractic, P.C., Aleksandr Mostovoy, D.C. (aty to be noticed) (Chiu, Wing)
August 18, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Simon Davydov served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
August 18, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Aleksandr Mostovoy, D.C. served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
August 18, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Emanuel David served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
August 18, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Wellmart RX, Inc. served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
August 18, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Practice Wiz, Inc. served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
August 18, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. APAK Chiropractic, P.C. served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
August 18, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Innovative Business Strategies, Inc. served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
August 18, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. MBCC Support Ltd. served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
August 18, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Stella Raytsin served on 7/31/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Micahel Y. Jacobi, D.O. served on 7/30/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
August 18, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Elena Mumin-Akhunov waiver sent on 8/17/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Michael Rubin on behalf of Emanuel David (aty to be noticed) (Rubin, Aaron)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Epione Medical, P.C. served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Lam on behalf of APAK Chiropractic, P.C., Aleksandr Mostovoy, D.C. (aty to be noticed) (Lam, Nancy)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Abraham M George on behalf of Epione Medical, P.C., Micahel Y. Jacobi, D.O., MBCC Support Ltd., Elena Mumin-Akhunov, Stella Raytsin (aty to be noticed) (George, Abraham) (Modified: Document replaced on 8/18/2021.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 8/26/2021 at 10:00 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 3970#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/14/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin Flanagan Keresey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Keresey, Caitlin)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Whitcher on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Whitcher, Michael)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Tilden on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Tilden, Nathan)
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine Garcia-Vieux on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Allstate Insurance Company against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14655239 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons with Rider, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4-1, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4-2, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 4-3, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 4-4, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 4-5, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 4-6, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 5-1, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 5-2, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 5-3, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 5-4, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #29 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #30 Certificate of No Liability) (King, Richard) (Attachment 8 replaced due to corrupt pdf on 7/20/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny).
July 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Epione Medical, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emanuel David
Represented By: Aaron Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruslan Nektalov
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epione Medical, P.C.
Represented By: Abraham M George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APAK Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Nancy Lam
Represented By: Oleg A. Mestechkin
Represented By: Wing K. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micahel Y. Jacobi, D.O.
Represented By: Abraham M George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleksandr Mostovoy, D.C.
Represented By: Nancy Lam
Represented By: Oleg A. Mestechkin
Represented By: Wing K. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmart RX, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Davydov
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Raytsin
Represented By: Abraham M George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elena Mumin-Akhunov
Represented By: Abraham M George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Practice Wiz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Business Strategies, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emanuel Davydov
Represented By: Aaron Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emik Davydov
Represented By: Aaron Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russ Nekta
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBCC Support Ltd. doing business as Billing Pros
Represented By: Abraham M George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Caitlin Flanagan Keresey
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Caitlin Flanagan Keresey
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Caitlin Flanagan Keresey
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Caitlin Flanagan Keresey
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?