Government Employees Insurance Company v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv04141
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN is hereby adopted. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/10/2021 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
September 10, 2021 Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/10/2021. Both sides present by telephone. The Court will adopt the parties' proposed Case Management Plan by separate order; fact discovery to end by 12/8/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 2, 2021 Set/Reset Hearing: Initial Status Conference previously set for 9/9/2021 is reset to 9/10/2021 at 12:30 PM. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 4141#, and are reminded to file a joint summary letter five days prior to the conference. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 1, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order submitted jointly by the parties and filed by Government Employees Insurance Company (Elem, Richard)
September 1, 2021 Filing 13 Letter to the Court, filed jointly by the parties, regarding plaintiff's claims and the United States' defenses by United States of America (Priore, Shana)
August 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Shana C. Priore on behalf of United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Priore, Shana)
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 This case has been designated to participate in the Court Annexed Arbitration Program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.7. The Rule requires the Clerk of Court to designate and process for compulsory arbitration "all civil cases (excluding social security cases, tax matters, prisoners' civil rights cases, and any action based on an alleged violation of a right secured by the Constitution of the United States or if jurisdiction is based in whole or in part on Title 28 U.S.C. sec. 1343) wherein money damages only are being sought in an amount not in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs." Damages are presumed not to be in excess of the arbitration limit unless a certification is filed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.7. An Arbitration Hearing will be scheduled after an Answer is filed. (Credle, Rita)
July 27, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (Credle, Rita)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #11 Case Referred to Arbitration. Counsel is advised that the referral to arbitration will not affect nor delay the Initial Status Conference scheduled for 9/9/2021 and the submission of the mandatory requirements at #10 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/27/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 9/9/2021 at 10:45 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 4141#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/25/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Attorney General summons, #2 US Postal summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Government Employees Insurance Company as subrogee of Michael J. Wisniewski identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Brooks, Other Affiliate Shaw Industries, Other Affiliate Heinz, Other Affiliate Benjamin Moore & Co., Other Affiliate United States Liability Insurance Group, Other Affiliate National Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate GEICO Insurance Agency, Inc., Other Affiliate GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GEICO Choice Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Acme Brick Company, Other Affiliate Applied Underwriters, Other Affiliate Ben Bridge Jeweler, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Energy Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance, Other Affiliate BH Media Group, Other Affiliate BoatU.S., Other Affiliate Borsheim's Fine Jewelry, Other Affiliate Buffalo NEWS, Buffalo NY, Other Affiliate BNSF, Other Affiliate Business Wire, Other Affiliate Central States Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Clayton Homes, Other Affiliate CORT Business Services, Other Affiliate CTB Inc., Other Affiliate Fechheimer Brothers Company, Other Affiliate FlightSafety, Other Affiliate Forest River, Other Affiliate Fruit of the Loom Companies, Other Affiliate Garan Incorporated, Other Affiliate Gateway Underwriters Agency, Other Affiliate General Re, Other Affiliate Guard Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Helzberg Diamonds, Other Affiliate H.H. Brown Shoe Group, Other Affiliate HomeServices of America, Inc., Other Affiliate International Dairy Queen, Inc., Other Affiliate IMC International Metalworking Companies, Other Affiliate Johns Manville, Other Affiliate Jordan's Furniture, Other Affiliate Justin Brands, Other Affiliate Larson-Juhl, Other Affiliate Lubrizol Corporation, Other Affiliate Marmon Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate McLane Company, Other Affiliate Medical Protective, Other Affiliate MiTek Inc., Other Affiliate Nebraska Furniture Mart, Other Affiliate NetJets, Other Affiliate Oriental Trading Company, Other Affiliate The Pampered Chef, Other Affiliate Precision Steel Warehouse, Inc., Other Affiliate RC Willey Home Furnishings, Other Affiliate Richline Group, Other Affiliate Scott Fetzer Companies, Other Affiliate See's Candies, Other Affiliate Star Furniture, Other Affiliate TTI Inc., Other Affiliate XTRA Corporation, Other Affiliate GEICO General Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GEICO Casaulty Company, Other Affiliate GEICO Indemnity Company for Government Employees Insurance Company as subrogee of Michael J. Wisniewski. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Elem, Richard)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Government Employees Insurance Company as subrogee of Michael J. Wisniewski (Elem, Richard)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Government Employees Insurance Company as subrogee of Michael J. Wisniewski (Elem, Richard)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Government Employees Insurance Company as subrogee of Michael J. Wisniewski (Elem, Richard)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Government Employees Insurance Company as subrogee of Michael J. Wisniewski (Elem, Richard)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14685598 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company as subrogee of Michael J. Wisniewski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Elem, Richard)
July 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Levi Elem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Shana C. Priore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?