Zhejiang Jinhua Jinli Mushroom Co., Ltd. v. Xin Ao International Group Corp.
Plaintiff: Zhejiang Jinhua Jinli Mushroom Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Xin Ao International Group Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04234
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Xin Ao International Group Corp. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Xin Ao International Group Corp. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #10 . Plaintiff is ORDERED to move for default judgment, including detailed proof of damages, no later than 10/6/2021, failing which this case will be dismissed. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/22/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Request for Certificate of Default by Zhejiang Jinhua Jinli Mushroom Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Clerk's Default) (Nurenberg, Steven)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Continue Deadlines Stated in the Mandatory Requirements for Initial Status Conference, and continue the September 21, 2021, Initial Status Conference by Zhejiang Jinhua Jinli Mushroom Co., Ltd.. (Nurenberg, Steven)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 . The Initial Status Conference scheduled for 9/21/2021 is adjourned without date on condition that if defendant continues to fail to appear, plaintiff shall request the Clerk to enter its default by 9/22/2021, failing which this case will be dismissed. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/16/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zhejiang Jinhua Jinli Mushroom Co., Ltd.. Xin Ao International Group Corp. served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (Nurenberg, Steven)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 9/21/2021 at 12:30 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 4234#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/28/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Xin Ao International Group Corp. (Neptune, Pierre)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zhejiang Jinhua Jinli Mushroom Co., Ltd. (Nurenberg, Steven)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xin Ao International Group Corp. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14699428 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Zhejiang Jinhua Jinli Mushroom Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Nurenberg, Steven)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhejiang Jinhua Jinli Mushroom Co., Ltd. v. Xin Ao International Group Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhejiang Jinhua Jinli Mushroom Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Steven Elwyn Nurenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xin Ao International Group Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?