Empire United Lines Co., Inc. v. Feldman et al
Defendant: Empire United Lines Co., Inc., Aleksander Feldman, Ella Feldman, Atlantic Transport & Logistics LLC, Javid Jafarov, Aleksander Pisman, Diamante Leasing, Mikheil Dodashvili, Exotic Cars MMDT, Inc., Lucky Auto, Inc., LTD Automoboli, Automobili Limited Company, Odil Iskandarov and Auto Global
Case Number: 1:2021cv04274
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 31 Letter by Aleksander Feldman (Popik, Roman)
September 24, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Empire United Lines Co., Inc.. (Glas, Eduardo)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #28 . Defendants Atlantic Transport & Logistics LLC, Aleksander Feldman and Ella Feldman's time to answer extended to 10/3/2021. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/24/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #31 Letter. Counsel is advised that that any letter filed in this action must include in the ECF entry line a brief description of the subject matter of the letter, e.g., "Letter re plaintiff's attempt to disqualify defendants' counsel," not simply, "Letter", so that the docket remains intelligible. Do not refile. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/24/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 23, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Javid Jafarov. (Shulov, Victor)
September 21, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aleksander Feldman. (Attachments: #1 Itinerary, #2 Email) (Popik, Roman)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff to file opposition to this motion, if any, by 9/24/2021. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/21/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 20, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Roman V. Popik on behalf of Ella Feldman (aty to be noticed) (Popik, Roman)
September 20, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Roman V. Popik on behalf of Aleksander Feldman (aty to be noticed) (Popik, Roman)
September 20, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Roman V. Popik on behalf of Atlantic Transport & Logistics LLC (aty to be noticed) (Popik, Roman)
September 17, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire United Lines Co., Inc.. Exotic Cars MMDT, Inc. served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Glas, Eduardo)
September 17, 2021 Filing 23 Request for Certificate of Default by Empire United Lines Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit proposed certificate of default against Aleksander Feldman, #3 Exhibit proposed certificate of default against Ella Feldman, #4 Exhibit proposed certificate of default against Atlantic Transport & Logistic) (Glas, Eduardo)
September 15, 2021 Filing 22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Javid Jafarov. (Shulov, Victor)
September 15, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor L Shulov on behalf of Javid Jafarov (aty to be noticed) (Shulov, Victor)
September 15, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for 9/22/21 by Empire United Lines Co., Inc.. (Glas, Eduardo)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part #20 . Initial Status Conference by telephone adjourned to 10/13/2021 at 10:00 AM. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 4274#, and are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements at #5 including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/15/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 . Defendant Javid Jafarov's time to answer extended to 10/6/2021. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/15/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 13, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire United Lines Co., Inc.. Auto Global served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Glas, Eduardo)
September 13, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire United Lines Co., Inc.. Lucky Auto, Inc. served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Glas, Eduardo)
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire United Lines Co., Inc.. Atlantic Transport & Logistics LLC served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021. (Glas, Eduardo)
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire United Lines Co., Inc.. Odil Iskandarov served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (Glas, Eduardo)
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire United Lines Co., Inc.. Mikheil Dodashvili served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Glas, Eduardo)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire United Lines Co., Inc.. Javid Jafarov served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. (Glas, Eduardo)
September 13, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire United Lines Co., Inc.. Aleksander Pisman served on 8/28/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Glas, Eduardo)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire United Lines Co., Inc.. Ella Feldman served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Glas, Eduardo)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire United Lines Co., Inc.. Aleksander Feldman served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Glas, Eduardo)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Mikheil Dodashvili, Exotic Cars MMDT, Inc.. (Marino, Charles)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles William Marino on behalf of Mikheil Dodashvili, Exotic Cars MMDT, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Marino, Charles)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 . Defendants Mikheil Dodashvili and Exotic Cars MMDT, Inc. time to answer extended to 9/29/2021. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/9/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re Letter, #1 Complaint,, by Empire United Lines Co., Inc. (Glas, Eduardo)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re Letter, #1 Complaint,, by Empire United Lines Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Ella Feldman, #2 Proposed Summons for Atlantic Transport & Logistics, #3 Proposed Summons for Javid Jafarov, #4 Proposed Summons for Aleksander Pisman, #5 Proposed Summons for Diamante Leasing, #6 Proposed Summons for Mikheil Dodashvili, #7 Proposed Summons for Exotic Cars MMDT, Inc., #8 Proposed Summons Lucky Auto, Inc., #9 Proposed Summons Automobili Limited Co., #10 Proposed Summons for LTD Automobili, #11 Proposed Summons for Odil Iskandarov, #12 Proposed Summons for Auto Global) (Glas, Eduardo)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 9/22/2021 at 10:00 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 4274#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/2/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 2, 2021 Your proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: If multiple defendants, there must be a Rider with a list of all names and addresses of defendants attached to the summons. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 31, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 31, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by Empire United Lines Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Aleksander Feldman, #2 Proposed Summons for Ella Feldman, #3 Proposed Summons Atlantic Transport & Logistic, #4 Proposed Summons for Javid Jafarov, #5 Proposed Summons for Aleksander Pisman, #6 Proposed Summons for Diamante Leasing, #7 Proposed Summons for Mikheil Dodashvili, #8 Proposed Summons for Exotic Cars MMDT, #9 Proposed Summons for Lucky Auto, #10 Proposed Summons for LTD Automobili, #11 Proposed Summons Automobili Limited Co., #12 Proposed Summons for Auto Global, #13 Proposed Summons for O. Iskandarov) (Glas, Eduardo)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aleksander Feldman, Ella Feldman, Atlantic Transport & Logistics LLC, Javid Jafarov, Aleksander Pisman, Diamante Leasing, Mikheil Dodashvili, Exotic Cars MMDT, Inc., Lucky Auto, Inc., LTD Automoboli, Automobili Limited Company, Odil Iskandarov, Auto Global filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14706711 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Empire United Lines Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to complaint, #2 Exhibit B to complaint) (Glas, Eduardo)
July 30, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit completed Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empire United Lines Co., Inc. v. Feldman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire United Lines Co., Inc.
Represented By: Eduardo J. Glas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleksander Feldman
Represented By: Roman V. Popik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ella Feldman
Represented By: Roman V. Popik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Transport & Logistics LLC
Represented By: Roman V. Popik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javid Jafarov
Represented By: Victor L Shulov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleksander Pisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamante Leasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikheil Dodashvili
Represented By: Charles William Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exotic Cars MMDT, Inc.
Represented By: Charles William Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Auto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTD Automoboli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automobili Limited Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odil Iskandarov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?