McCahill v. Distefano et al
Plaintiff: James J. McCahill
Defendant: Francesco Distefano, Strong's Marine, LLC, Strong's Waterclub & Marina, LLC., Strong's Marine, Inc., Strong's Marine Boat Rental, Inc., Town of Southold, Nicholas P. Soullas, Megan Blanchard and William Blanchard
Case Number: 1:2021cv04276
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks: CIVIL CAUSE FOR INITIAL CONFERENCE. Counsel For Plaintiff: Dean Geller Aronin (FOR James J. McCahill). Counsel For Defendant: No Appearances. Video Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/15/2021 at 10:00 am. Initial Conference held on this case, along with 21-cv-1961. No appearances have been filed yet by claimants in this action. Accordingly, a Scheduling Order was not entered at this time. The parties in the related action, 21-cv-1961, expressed interest in staying discovery pending a decision on the motion to dismiss, which is set to be fully submitted to the Court on September 27, 2021. The parties in 21-cv-1961 were directed to submit a letter motion for leave to stay discovery on or before September 27, 2021. (FTR Log #10:05-10:17 (video).)(Ortiz, Grisel)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Pursuant to the Administrative Order No. 2021-04-6 dated 8/27/2021, the Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 10:00 AM will now be held via the Court's Video Zoom instead of in-person. The Court will email the Zoom invitation to all the parties listed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 8/30/2021. (Ortiz, Grisel)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 am on 9/15/2021 before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks in courtroom 1020. All counsel must attend. Because the cases are related, this initial conference will also concern 21-CV-1961. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than 9/8/2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 8/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Plan Worksheet, #2 JMW Individual Practice Rules) (Ortiz, Grisel)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet.. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14707095 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by James J. McCahill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Sheet & Arb, #2 Notice, #3 Order, #4 Monition) (Aronin, Dean)
July 30, 2021 Notice of Related Case: 21-cv-1961 indicates a related case. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks (as related to 21-cv-1961) for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/30/2021. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCahill v. Distefano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. McCahill
Represented By: Dean Geller Aronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francesco Distefano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strong's Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strong's Waterclub & Marina, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strong's Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strong's Marine Boat Rental, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Southold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas P. Soullas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?