Magnacross LLC v. Militope Corporation
Plaintiff: Magnacross LLC
Defendant: Militope Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv04300
Filed: July 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Magnacross LLC (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 Letter by Magnacross LLC (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
September 23, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (Greene, Donna)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The plaintiff's response to the defendant's letter requesting a pre-motion conference was due on September 16, 2021. The plaintiff did not file a letter by that date or request more time to do so. The plaintiff is directed to file a response no later than September 24, 2021. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 9/20/2021. (Dang, Michelle)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 11/30/2021 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon. The parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 11/23/2021. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/17/2021. (Lozar, Ryan)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Militope Corporation (Steineker, Clyde)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for pre motion conference (Request for Pre-Motion Conference) by Militope Corporation. (Steineker, Clyde)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 4(A) of my Individual Practices and Rules, the plaintiff's response to the defendant's motion for a pre-motion conference #7 is due by September 16, 2021. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 9/9/2021. (Dang, Michelle)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Magnacross LLC. (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Magnacross LLC. Militope Corporation served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Militope Corporation. (Neptune, Pierre)
July 31, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)
July 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Militope Corporation filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14710521 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Magnacross LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1: US Pat. No. 6,917,304, #4 Exhibit 2: Claim Chart) (Loaknauth, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magnacross LLC v. Militope Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnacross LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Loaknauth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Militope Corporation
Represented By: Clyde Whittaker Steineker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?