Rosato v. The Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Gerard Rosato
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv04337
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Scheduling Order by Gerard Rosato (Chiatto, Elizabeth)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for October 12, 2021 at 12:00 p.m., before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge at (888) 684-8852; Access Code #: 6223489. All counsel must be available. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 IC QUESTIONNAIRE, #2 INDIVIDUAL RULES) (Marino, Janine)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Long Island Railroad Company. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Long Island Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transport Authority, Other Affiliate Triborough Bridge & Tunnel Authority, Other Affiliate Metro North Commuter Railroad Company, Other Affiliate New York City Transit Authority, Other Affiliate Staten Island Railway/Staten Island Rapid Transit Operating Authority, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company for The Long Island Railroad Company. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Long Island Railroad Company. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Long Island Railroad Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14715951 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Gerard Rosato. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Vogt, Philip)
August 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosato v. The Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Rosato
Represented By: Philip Patrick Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?