Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Yusupov et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Casualty Company
Defendant: Arthur Yusupov, Sabas NY Services, Inc., Gaogui Leasing Corp., ABR Funding, Inc. and John Doe Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv04450
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 16 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to Judge Block by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Vanunu, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. ABR Funding, Inc. served on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (Levy, Barry)
September 22, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Sabas NY Services, Inc. served on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (Levy, Barry)
September 22, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Gaogui Leasing Corp. served on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (Levy, Barry)
September 22, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Arthur Yusupov served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (Levy, Barry)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for DefendantsArthur Yusupov, Sabas NY Services, Inc.,Gaogui Leasing Corp., and ABR Funding, Inc., Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint by October 21, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/22/2021. (Vertus, Miriam)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, to October 21, 2021 by ABR Funding, Inc., Gaogui Leasing Corp., Sabas NY Services, Inc., Arthur Yusupov. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation) (Conroy, Matthew)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. B. Hewitt, III on behalf of ABR Funding, Inc., Gaogui Leasing Corp., Sabas NY Services, Inc., Arthur Yusupov (aty to be noticed) (Hewitt, Robert)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Conroy on behalf of ABR Funding, Inc., Gaogui Leasing Corp., Sabas NY Services, Inc., Arthur Yusupov (aty to be noticed) (Conroy, Matthew)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip P. Nash on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Nash, Philip)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Vanunu on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Vanunu, Michael)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Sirignano on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sirignano, Michael)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Levy, Barry)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABR Funding, Inc., Gaogui Leasing Corp., John Doe Defendants 1-10, Sabas NY Services, Inc., Arthur Yusupov filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14730551 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - NO,, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date - Sabas Defendants, #4 Exhibit 2 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified to Date - Gaogui Defendants) (Levy, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Yusupov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Philip P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Philip P. Nash
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Philip P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Philip P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Yusupov
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Represented By: Robert E. B. Hewitt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabas NY Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Represented By: Robert E. B. Hewitt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaogui Leasing Corp.
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Represented By: Robert E. B. Hewitt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABR Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Represented By: Robert E. B. Hewitt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?