Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. et al v. Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. and Bi-Lo Holding, LLC
Defendant: Keurig Green Mountain, Inc., Green Mountain Coffee Roasters, Inc. and Keurig, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2021cv04454
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 25
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 CASE: 1:21-cv-04454DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:21-cv-07504, filed 09/10/2021. (Marziliano, August)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-3:Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of New York for the reasons stated in the order of June 3, 2014, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vernon S. Broderick. (Marziliano, August)
September 8, 2021 Case transferred to District of southern District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Green Mountain Coffee Roasters, Inc., Keurig Green Mountain, Inc., Keurig, Incorporated. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Bi-Lo Holding, LLC, Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Rider to Summons) (Iovieno, Philip)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Green Mountain Coffee Roasters, Inc., Keurig Green Mountain, Inc., Keurig, Incorporated filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14730782 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc., Bi-Lo Holding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Iovieno, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. et al v. Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bi-Lo Holding, LLC
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Mountain Coffee Roasters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keurig, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?