Valente v. American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: PAULA VALENTE
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04525
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Taryn A Merkl
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Paula Valente. (Mittler, Brett)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to respond, pursuant to the Court's individual rules (Rule III.A), to defendant's motion for a pre-motion conference #6 no later than September 23, 2021. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 9/16/2021. (Guo, Alicia)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by American Airlines, Inc.. (Weyand, Jacqueline)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to File #5 is granted, on consent. Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 9/2/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 8/18/2021. (Devanathan, Deepa)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by American Airlines, Inc.. (Weyand, Jacqueline)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Zachary Mittler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Mittler, Brett)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 16, 2021 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 16, 2021 FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number 4653159239 (Davis, Kimberly)
August 16, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Airlines, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York County of Queens, case number 715581-2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service) (Davis, Kimberly)
August 12, 2021 The case of Valent v. American Airlines, Inc., has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. The case number is 21-cv-4525. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within seven (7) days. Select the event (Civil Case Filing Fee) and pay online. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valente v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULA VALENTE
Represented By: David H Mayer
Represented By: Brett Zachary Mittler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Weyand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?