Coombs v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Andrea Coombs
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv04591
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
2 Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/7/2021. The Court conducts a telephonic initial conference. Fact discovery must be completed by April 7, 2022. Pleadings may be amended and new parties added as of right by November 11, 2021. Plaintiff's medical expert disclosures shall be served by March 4, 2022; defendants' are due by April 7, 2022. The Court defers setting a schedule for non-medical experts, expert depositions and requesting a premotion conference. A settlement conference will be held on April 14, 2022 at 2:00 p.m., the clients must attend. As the date approaches, the parties will be notified of the logistics for the conference. See attached. (Proujansky, Josh)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen H. Frankel on behalf of Andrea Coombs (notification declined or already on case) (Frankel, Stephen)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Andrea Coombs Initial Conference Questionnaire (Frankel, Stephen)
September 30, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: For CEO purposes: Initial Conference is set for 10/7/2021 @ 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. (LK)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Andrea Coombs (Frankel, Stephen)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Diane Gujarati for all further proceedings. Judge Allyne R. Ross no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/17/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on October 7, 2021 @ 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE.Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by 3:00 p.m. on October 5, 2021. *** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833.If the parties are initially unable to connect to the call, please try again as the third-party conference call system has been overloaded at times.(LK)Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/16/2021. (LK)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Bostick, Kenneth)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Supreme Court - County of Kings, case number 512578/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14753654) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Bostick, Kenneth)
August 16, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coombs v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Coombs
Represented By: Stephen H. Frankel
Represented By: Melissa A Lenowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth L. Bostick, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?