Lendterra, Inc. v. Bais Yaakov of Brooklyn, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lendterra, Inc.
Defendant: Bais Yaakov of Brooklyn, Inc., Yeshiva Torah Vodaath Inc. and New York City Environmental Control Board
Case Number: 1:2021cv04647
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File default pursuant to Rule 55(a) by Lendterra, Inc.. (Weinreb, Alan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by November 1, 2021 by Bais Yaakov of Brooklyn, Inc.. (Margolin, Yan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Yan Margolin on behalf of Bais Yaakov of Brooklyn, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Margolin, Yan)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 #16 . That portion of the Court's Order of 9/21/2021 requiring plaintiff to request entry of default is vacated. Defendant Bais Yaakov of Brooklyn's time to answer extended to 11/1/2021. A telephonic initial status conference is set for 11/9/2021 at 10:00 AM. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 4647#. The parties are directed to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference at #11 including filing on the docket a completed case management plan two days prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/12/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for 9/30/2021 by Lendterra, Inc.. (Weinreb, Alan)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Plaintiff had no right under the Federal Rules to "grant" defendant an extension to answer as under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b), such extensions are up to the Court, not plaintiff's counsel. Defendant therefore is in default. The Initial Status Conference is adjourned without date on condition that should defendant continue to fail to appear, plaintiff shall request that the Clerk of Court enter defendant's default under Rule 55(a) prior to 9/30/2021. Should plaintiff fail to make that request, the case will be dismissed. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/21/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lendterra, Inc.. Bais Yaakov of Brooklyn, Inc. served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Smikun, Alan)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 9/30/2021 at 12:00 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 4647#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/18/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Bais Yaakov of Brooklyn, Inc., New York City Environmental Control Board, Yeshiva Torah Vodaath Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Smikun on behalf of Lendterra, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Smikun, Alan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Lendterra, Inc. (Weinreb, Alan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Lendterra, Inc. (Weinreb, Alan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Lendterra, Inc. (Weinreb, Alan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lendterra, Inc. (Weinreb, Alan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Lendterra, Inc. (Weinreb, Alan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bais Yaakov of Brooklyn, Inc., New York City Environmental Control Board, Yeshiva Torah Vodaath Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14763144 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Lendterra, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Schedule, #2 Exhibit B- Judgment/Liens, #3 Exhibit C- Mortgage, Assignment of Leases, Security Agreement, #4 Exhibit D- Secured Note, #5 Exhibit E part 1 - Assignments of Mortgage, #6 Exhibit E part 2 - Assignments of Mortgage, #7 Exhibit E part 3 - Assignments of Mortgage, #8 Exhibit E part 4 - Assignments of Mortgage, #9 Exhibit F- Forbearance Agreement, #10 Exhibit G- Default Notice, #11 Exhibit H- Mortgagor Hardship Declaration Letter) (Weinreb, Alan)
August 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lendterra, Inc. v. Bais Yaakov of Brooklyn, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lendterra, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Smikun
Represented By: Alan H Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bais Yaakov of Brooklyn, Inc.
Represented By: Yan Margolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yeshiva Torah Vodaath Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Environmental Control Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?