Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Ready Rx, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and Geico Casualty Company
Defendant: Ready Rx, LLC, Igor Aronov and Albert Pinkhasov
Case Number: 1:2021cv04765
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan C Goldberg on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Goldberg, Ryan)
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Stipulation by Igor Aronov, Albert Pinkhasov, Ready Rx, LLC. (Bowers, Nicholas)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Defendants Ready Rx, LLC., Igor Aronov, and Albert Pinkhaso Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint #1 by 10/29/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/23/2021. (Vertus, Miriam)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Bowers on behalf of Igor Aronov, Albert Pinkhasov, Ready Rx, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Bowers, Nicholas)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Ready Rx, LLC served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Sirignano, Michael)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Igor Aronov served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. (Sirignano, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna Betty Rosenblatt on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Rosenblatt, Joanna)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Priscilla DeLing Kam on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Kam, Priscilla)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry I. Levy on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Levy, Barry)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Sirignano, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Igor Aronov, Albert Pinkhasov, Ready Rx, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14778443 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1-Representative Sample of Fraudlent Claims submitted by Ready Rx, LLC, #4 Exhibit 2-Representative Sample of the Prescriptions Issued by the Prescribing Providers) (Sirignano, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Ready Rx, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Joanna Betty Rosenblatt
Represented By: Priscilla DeLing Kam
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Ryan C Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Joanna Betty Rosenblatt
Represented By: Priscilla DeLing Kam
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Ryan C Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Joanna Betty Rosenblatt
Represented By: Priscilla DeLing Kam
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Ryan C Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Joanna Betty Rosenblatt
Represented By: Priscilla DeLing Kam
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Ryan C Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ready Rx, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igor Aronov
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Pinkhasov
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?