Smalls v. Faniel
Plaintiff: Wayne Smalls
Defendant: William Faniel
Case Number: 1:2021cv04767
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 10/14/2021. (Van Buren, Ethan)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14929395. by Wayne Smalls. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Counsel's Supporting Declaration, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Raynor, E.)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/24/2021) (Bowens, Priscilla).
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wayne Smalls. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order) (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Faniel Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes.,, filed by Wayne Smalls. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Motion Counsel's Notice of Motion for Pro Hac Admission, #3 Affidavit in Support Counsel's Declaration in Support of Pro Hac Admission, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Raynor, E.)
August 24, 2021 NOTICE: You must pay the Pro Hac Vice filing fee of $150.00. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 24, 2021 FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number ANYEDC-14778443 (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 24, 2021 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smalls v. Faniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Smalls
Represented By: E. Dubois Raynor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Faniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?