Cohen et al v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Justin Cohen and Kyala Schenck
Defendant: City of New York, NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea, NYPD Chief of Dept. Terence Monahan, NYPD Officer Thomas Demery, NYPD Officer Miguel Marquez, NYPD Officer Adnan Hussain, John and Jane Does 1-14 and Mayor Bill De Blasio
Case Number: 1:2021cv04821
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Fredrick Frank on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Frank, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 the City's Request to the Court for a 60-Day Extension of Time until 11/30/21 to Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint; and sua sponte, grant a corresponding extension for the individual officers. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 9/30/2021. (Marino, Janine)
September 23, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by City of New York. (Ryan, Erin)
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyala Schenck, Justin Cohen. Dermot Shea served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyala Schenck, Justin Cohen. Terence Monahan served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyala Schenck, Justin Cohen. Adnan Hussain served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyala Schenck, Justin Cohen. Thomas Demery served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyala Schenck, Justin Cohen. Bill De Blasio served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyala Schenck, Justin Cohen. City of New York served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elena Louisa Cohen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Elena)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica S. Massimi on behalf of Justin Cohen, Kyala Schenck (aty to be noticed) (Massimi, Jessica)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gideon Orion Oliver on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Oliver, Gideon)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City of New York, Bill De Blasio, Thomas Demery, Adnan Hussain, Miguel Marquez, Terence Monahan, Dermot Shea. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Justin Cohen, Kyala Schenck (Green, Remy)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Justin Cohen, Kyala Schenck (Attachments: #1 Supplement Related Case Statement) (Green, Remy)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, Thomas Demery, Adnan Hussain, John and Jane Does 1-14, Miguel Marquez, Terence Monahan filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14787128 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Kyala Schenck, Justin Cohen. (Green, Remy)
August 26, 2021 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case (21-cv-03096-DG-TAM). (Neptune, Pierre)
August 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen et al v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Cohen
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Jessica S. Massimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyala Schenck
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Jessica S. Massimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Jeffrey Fredrick Frank
Represented By: Erin T. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Chief of Dept. Terence Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Thomas Demery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Miguel Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Adnan Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-14
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill De Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?