Laura v. HD Development of Maryland, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pompura Jane Laura
Defendant: HD Development of Maryland, Inc. and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04837
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. Mirisola, Jr on behalf of Pompura Jane Laura (aty to be noticed) (Mirisola, Charles)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Kremen on behalf of Pompura Jane Laura (notification declined or already on case) (Kremen, David)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon. The parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 11/9/2021. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/17/2021. (Lozar, Ryan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Gabriel, Meagan)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Gabriel, Meagan)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Gabriel, Meagan)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Nathan Giacopelli on behalf of HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Giacopelli, Michael)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from Supreme Court of New York, Kings County, case number 517272/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14789494) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Email re Value) (Gabriel, Meagan)
August 27, 2021 Notice: Re: The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please submit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 27, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 27, 2021 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laura v. HD Development of Maryland, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pompura Jane Laura
Represented By: David L. Kremen
Represented By: Charles J. Mirisola, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Development of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Nathan Giacopelli
Represented By: Meagan Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Michael Nathan Giacopelli
Represented By: Meagan Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?