Valentine v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Rayne Valentine
Defendant: City of New York, Mayor Bill de Blasio, NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea, NYPD Detective Amjad Kasaji and NYPD Members John Does 1-4
Case Number: 1:2021cv04867
Filed: August 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/21/2021. Gideon Oliver for Plaintiff. Joshua Kaufman for City Defendant. See separate docket entry for conference Order. (FTR Log #3:00-3:24.) (Lozar, Ryan)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER. For the reasons discussed on the 10/21/2021 conference record, the Court grants the Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #15 through and including 12/6/2021. The parties are to serve initial disclosures by 1/7/2022 and discovery requests by 1/21/2022. Joinder or pleading amendment due 3/25/2022. Fact discovery will close on 8/31/2022, and the parties will file a joint letter that same date certifying it is complete. Any party initiating dispositive motion practice shall do so in accordance with the District Judge's Individual Rules on or before 9/30/2022. The parties will file a Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by 10/28/2022. A Telephone Conference is set for 6/2/2022 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. On or before 5/24/2022, the parties will file a joint status report. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/21/2021. (Lozar, Ryan)
October 18, 2021 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT in reference to the Electronic Order dated October 12, 2021 by City of New York (Kaufman, Joshua)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: A Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 10/21/2021 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 10/18/2021, the City Defendant shall file a status report regarding its progress gathering information referenced in its motion at #15 , which the Court will address at the appearance. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/12/2021. (Lozar, Ryan)
October 1, 2021 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer in reference to Docket Entry Number 1 by City of New York. (Kaufman, Joshua)
October 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S Kaufman on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Kaufman, Joshua)
September 15, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rayne Valentine. Dermot Shea served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rayne Valentine. Amjad Kasaji served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rayne Valentine. Bill de Blasio served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rayne Valentine. City of New York served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elena Louisa Cohen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Elena)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to City of New York, Amjad Kasaji, Dermot Shea, Bill de Blasio. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica S. Massimi on behalf of Rayne Valentine (aty to be noticed) (Massimi, Jessica)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Rayne Valentine (Green, Remy)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gideon Orion Oliver on behalf of Rayne Valentine (aty to be noticed) (Oliver, Gideon)
August 29, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Rayne Valentine (Green, Remy)
August 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, Amjad Kasaji, NYPD Members John Does 1-4, Dermot Shea, Bill de Blasio filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14792416 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Rayne Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Gray et al. Complaint) (Green, Remy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayne Valentine
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: Jessica S. Massimi
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Joshua S Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill de Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Detective Amjad Kasaji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Members John Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?