Norton v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Jack Norton
Defendant: City of New York, Mayor Bill de Blasio, NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea, NYPD Chief of Dep Terence Monahan, NYPD Officer Jonathan Warfield and NYPD Members John and Jane Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2021cv04884
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: James R Cho
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants City of New York, Police Officer Jonathan Warfield, Commissioner Dermot Shea, and Mayor Bill DeBlasio shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by November 15, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 10/20/2021. (Gillespie, Saudia)
October 1, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Matthew Suhovsky on behalf of City of New York (notification declined or already on case) (Suhovsky, Stephen)
October 1, 2021 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of New York. (Suhovsky, Stephen)
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Norton. Jonathan Warfield served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Norton. Dermot Shea served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Norton. Terence Monahan served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Norton. Bill de Blasio served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Norton. City of New York served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica S. Massimi on behalf of Jack Norton (notification declined or already on case) (Massimi, Jessica)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elena Louisa Cohen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Elena)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica S. Massimi on behalf of Jack Norton (aty to be noticed) (Massimi, Jessica)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gideon Orion Oliver on behalf of Jack Norton (aty to be noticed) (Oliver, Gideon)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City of New York, Terence Monahan, NYPD Members John and Jane Does 1-5, Dermot Shea, Jonathan Warfield, Bill de Blasio. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Jack Norton (Green, Remy)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Jack Norton (Green, Remy)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, Terence Monahan, NYPD Members John and Jane Does 1-5, Dermot Shea, Jonathan Warfield, Bill de Blasio filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14795365 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jack Norton. (Green, Remy)
August 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Norton
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Jessica S. Massimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Suhovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill de Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Chief of Dep Terence Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Jonathan Warfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Members John and Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?