Black et al v. Mesa Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Black, Lennon Palomino, Daquan Vandross and Richard Vaughn
Defendant: Mesa Airlines, Inc. and United Airlines, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv04896
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Vaughn, James Black, Daquan Vandross, Lennon Palomino. United Airlines, Inc served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Zeitzoff, David)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Vaughn, James Black, Daquan Vandross, Lennon Palomino. Mesa Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Zeitzoff, David)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Arthur Zeitzoff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Zeitzoff, David)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mesa Airlines, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14797344 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Richard Vaughn, James Black, Daquan Vandross, Lennon Palomino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Mesa Airlines, #3 Proposed Summons United Airlines) (Bohrer, Abram)
August 31, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black et al v. Mesa Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Black
Represented By: Abram I. Bohrer
Represented By: David Arthur Zeitzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennon Palomino
Represented By: Abram I. Bohrer
Represented By: David Arthur Zeitzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daquan Vandross
Represented By: Abram I. Bohrer
Represented By: David Arthur Zeitzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Vaughn
Represented By: Abram I. Bohrer
Represented By: David Arthur Zeitzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?