Campos et al v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: LAQUANA CAMPOS, on behalf of herself and her minor child, K.C.; TOSHA ADAMS; NORMAN MARSH; and BETTI RODNYANSKAYA, individually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated, Laquana Campos, K.C., Tosha Adams, Norman Marsh, Betti Rodnyanskaya and Laquana Campos, on behalf of herself and her minor child, K.C.
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv05143
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmela T. Romeo on behalf of Tosha Adams, Laquana Campos, on behalf of herself and her minor child, K.C., Norman Marsh, Betti Rodnyanskaya (aty to be noticed) (Romeo, Carmela)
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Marie Spadafore on behalf of Tosha Adams, Laquana Campos, K.C., Laquana Campos, on behalf of herself and her minor child, K.C., Norman Marsh, Betti Rodnyanskaya (aty to be noticed) (Spadafore, Michelle)
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14999555. by Tosha Adams, Laquana Campos, K.C., Laquana Campos, on behalf of herself and her minor child, K.C., Norman Marsh, Betti Rodnyanskaya. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit) (Lang, Kathryn)
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Regan Bailey Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14986475. by Tosha Adams, Laquana Campos, K.C., Laquana Campos, on behalf of herself and her minor child, K.C., Norman Marsh, Betti Rodnyanskaya. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Bailey, Regan)
October 29, 2021 Incorrect Case/Entry Information: The Order Dismissing Case filed on 10/29/2021 was entered on the wrong docket as has been removed. Please disregard. (Lee, Tiffeny)
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14978213. by Tosha Adams, Laquana Campos, K.C., Laquana Campos, on behalf of herself and her minor child, K.C., Norman Marsh, Betti Rodnyanskaya. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Wong, Carol)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 Letter Regarding Service of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Provisional Class Certification by Tosha Adams, Norman Marsh, Betti Rodnyanskaya, Laquana Campos, on behalf of herself and her minor child, K.C. (Boston, Sheila)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order The parties' joint request for a consolidated motion at #8 is granted. Per the Court's bundling rule, plaintiffs may serve a consolidated motion on defendant by 10/26/2021 (but the motion shall not be filed on the docket at that time). See Judge Kovner's Individual Rules IV.B. Plaintiffs may serve a response on defendant by 1/11/2022 (but the response shall not be filed on the docket at that time). Defendant may serve a reply on plaintiffs, if any, by 02/10/2022. The parties shall file all the documents associated with the fully-briefed motion with the Court by 02/10/2022. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 10/25/2021. (Andrews, Stephen)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 Letter re Joint Request for Consolidated Motion and Briefing Schedule by Tosha Adams, Laquana Campos, Norman Marsh, Betti Rodnyanskaya (Boston, Sheila)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Jois on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Jois, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Grace Ranucci on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Ranucci, Jessica)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle F Tarantolo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Tarantolo, Danielle)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 15, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by K.C.; TOSHA ADAMS; NORMAN MARSH; and BETTI RODNYANSKAYA, individually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated, LAQUANA CAMPOS, on behalf of herself and her minor child (Boston, Sheila)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, Acting Commissioner of Social Security filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14841679 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by LAQUANA CAMPOS, on behalf of herself and her minor child, K.C.; TOSHA ADAMS; NORMAN MARSH; and BETTI RODNYANSKAYA, individually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Boston, Sheila)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos et al v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAQUANA CAMPOS, on behalf of herself and her minor child
Represented By: Sheila Sabrina Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.C.; TOSHA ADAMS; NORMAN MARSH; and BETTI RODNYANSKAYA, individually and on behalf of all persons similarly situated
Represented By: Sheila Sabrina Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laquana Campos
Represented By: Carol Wong
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Jois
Represented By: Jessica Grace Ranucci
Represented By: Kathryn Lang
Represented By: Michelle Marie Spadafore
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Sheila Sabrina Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.C.
Represented By: Carol Wong
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Jois
Represented By: Jessica Grace Ranucci
Represented By: Kathryn Lang
Represented By: Michelle Marie Spadafore
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Sheila Sabrina Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tosha Adams
Represented By: Carmela T. Romeo
Represented By: Carol Wong
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Jois
Represented By: Jessica Grace Ranucci
Represented By: Kathryn Lang
Represented By: Michelle Marie Spadafore
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Sheila Sabrina Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Marsh
Represented By: Carmela T. Romeo
Represented By: Carol Wong
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Jois
Represented By: Jessica Grace Ranucci
Represented By: Kathryn Lang
Represented By: Michelle Marie Spadafore
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Sheila Sabrina Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betti Rodnyanskaya
Represented By: Carmela T. Romeo
Represented By: Carol Wong
Represented By: Danielle F Tarantolo
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Jois
Represented By: Jessica Grace Ranucci
Represented By: Kathryn Lang
Represented By: Michelle Marie Spadafore
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Sheila Sabrina Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laquana Campos, on behalf of herself and her minor child, K.C.
Represented By: Carmela T. Romeo
Represented By: Carol Wong
Represented By: Kathryn Lang
Represented By: Michelle Marie Spadafore
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?