Raritan Baykeeper, Inc. et al v. American Recycling Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Raritan Baykeeper, Inc., Riverkeeper, Inc., Caroll Forbes and Crystal Ervin
Defendant: American Recycling Management, LLC, Christopher Hein, Regal Recycling Co. Inc., Royal Carting Company, Inc., Royal Waste Services, Inc., Michael Reali and Paul Reali
Case Number: 1:2021cv05211
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Caroll Forbes, Riverkeeper, Inc., Crystal Ervin, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.. (Rotenberg, Edan)
November 12, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Caroll Forbes, Riverkeeper, Inc., Crystal Ervin, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.. (Rotenberg, Edan)
October 15, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Morrison on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Morrison, Kaitlin)
October 12, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caroll Forbes, Riverkeeper, Inc., Crystal Ervin, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.. (Rotenberg, Edan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caroll Forbes, Riverkeeper, Inc., Crystal Ervin, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.. (Rotenberg, Edan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caroll Forbes, Riverkeeper, Inc., Crystal Ervin, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.. (Rotenberg, Edan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caroll Forbes, Riverkeeper, Inc., Crystal Ervin, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.. (Rotenberg, Edan)
October 8, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Caroll Forbes, Riverkeeper, Inc., Crystal Ervin, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.. (Rotenberg, Edan)
October 8, 2021 Filing 18 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other response by Paul Reali, Michael Reali, Regal Recycling Co. Inc., Royal Carting Company, Inc., Royal Waste Services, Inc.. (Sullivan, Peter)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #18 . Defendants Paul Reali, Michael Reali, Regal Recycling Co. Inc., Royal Carting Company, Inc. and Royal Waste Services, Inc.'s time to answer extended to 12/19/2021. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/8/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
October 7, 2021 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by American Recycling Management, LLC, Christopher Hein. (Knauer, Elizabeth)
October 7, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Read Knauer on behalf of American Recycling Management, LLC, Christopher Hein (aty to be noticed) (Knauer, Elizabeth)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 . Defendants American Recycling Management LLC and Christopher Hein's time to answer extended to 12/19/2021. Initial Status Conference adjourned to 12/15/2021 1:00 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 5211#, and are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements at #13 including filing on the docket a completed case management plan two days prior to the conference. In addition, plaintiff is directed to file proof of service as to each defendant promptly, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/7/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Iachan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Iachan, Melissa)
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 11/2/2021 at 12:45 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 5211#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements including filing on the docket a completed case management plan two days prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/21/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 21, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. by Crystal Ervin, Caroll Forbes, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc., Riverkeeper, Inc. (Rotenberg, Edan)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 21, 2021 Your proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: If multiple defendants, there must be a Rider with a list of all names and addresses of defendants attached to the summons. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 20, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Crystal Ervin, Caroll Forbes, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc., Riverkeeper, Inc. (Rotenberg, Edan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by Crystal Ervin, Caroll Forbes, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc., Riverkeeper, Inc. (Rotenberg, Edan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by Crystal Ervin, Caroll Forbes, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc., Riverkeeper, Inc. (Rotenberg, Edan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Crystal Ervin, Caroll Forbes, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc., Riverkeeper, Inc. (Rotenberg, Edan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Crystal Ervin, Caroll Forbes, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc., Riverkeeper, Inc. (Rotenberg, Edan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Crystal Ervin, Caroll Forbes, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc., Riverkeeper, Inc. (Rotenberg, Edan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Crystal Ervin, Caroll Forbes, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc., Riverkeeper, Inc. (Rotenberg, Edan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Crystal Ervin, Caroll Forbes, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc., Riverkeeper, Inc. (Rotenberg, Edan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Recycling Management, LLC, Christopher Hein, Paul Reali, Michael Reali, Regal Recycling Co. Inc., Royal Carting Company, Inc., Royal Waste Services, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14851086 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Caroll Forbes, Riverkeeper, Inc., Crystal Ervin, Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (Rotenberg, Edan)
September 20, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raritan Baykeeper, Inc. et al v. American Recycling Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raritan Baykeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Kaitlin Morrison
Represented By: Melissa Iachan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riverkeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Kaitlin Morrison
Represented By: Melissa Iachan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroll Forbes
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Kaitlin Morrison
Represented By: Melissa Iachan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Ervin
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Kaitlin Morrison
Represented By: Melissa Iachan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Recycling Management, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Read Knauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Hein
Represented By: Elizabeth Read Knauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Recycling Co. Inc.
Represented By: Peter R. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Carting Company, Inc.
Represented By: Peter R. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Waste Services, Inc.
Represented By: Peter R. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Reali
Represented By: Peter R. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Reali
Represented By: Peter R. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?