Garson et al v. Caldwell Marine International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Scott Garson and Karen Garson
Defendant: Caldwell Marine International, LLC, Atlantic Coast Tug and Marine, LLC, CABLE BARGE and Tug Fort Point
Case Number: 1:2021cv05351
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marcia M Henry
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: A video initial conference is scheduled for 01/20/2022 at 2:00PM before Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. All counsel must attend via video. The parties shall join the video call (5) minutes before the conference. A video Zoom link will be sent to the parties. The public can call the toll-free number 646-828-7666. The Meeting ID is 161-848-2387.Counsel are directed to review the attached Initial Conference Order and this Court's Individual Practice Rules for instructions. By 01/13/2022, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the attached Proposed Discovery Plan (also available in PDF format at: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/localrules/ProposedDiscoveryPlanMMH.pdf). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan, #2 Individual Practice Rules) (Castro, Ricardo)
November 11, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Atlantic Coast Tug and Marine, LLC. (Danielsen, Kenneth)
November 11, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Tug and Marine, LLC (Danielsen, Kenneth)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Atlantic Coast Tug and Marine, LLC answer due 11/11/2021. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 10/28/2021.(Andrews, Stephen)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Caldwell Marine International, LLC. (Flood, Edward)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caldwell Marine International, LLC (Flood, Edward)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Atlantic Coast Tug and Marine, LLC. (Danielsen, Kenneth)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Garson, Karen Garson. Caldwell Marine International, LLC served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Schweitzer, Timothy)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul T. Hofmann on behalf of Karen Garson, Scott Garson (aty to be noticed) (Hofmann, Paul)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Atlantic Coast Tug and Marine, LLC, Caldwell Marine International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Atlantic summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 27, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atlantic Coast Tug and Marine, LLC, CABLE BARGE, Caldwell Marine International, LLC, Tug Fort Point filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14875699 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Scott Garson, Karen Garson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Schweitzer, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garson et al v. Caldwell Marine International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Garson
Represented By: Timothy F. Schweitzer
Represented By: Paul T. Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Garson
Represented By: Timothy F. Schweitzer
Represented By: Paul T. Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caldwell Marine International, LLC
Represented By: Edward Philip Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Coast Tug and Marine, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth B. Danielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CABLE BARGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tug Fort Point
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?