Lall v. Qatar Airways Q.C.S.C.
Plaintiff: Vinod Lall
Defendant: Qatar Airways Q.C.S.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05387
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Vinod Lall. (Applebaum, Erin)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 . Initial Status Conference adjourned to 12/1/2021 at 1:00 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 5387#, and they are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference set forth at #5 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/10/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vinod Lall. Qatar Airways Q.C.S.C. served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Applebaum, Erin)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Qatar Airways Q.C.S.C.. (Guzzi, Roseann)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Vinod Lall (Applebaum, Erin)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 11/16/2021 at 11:30 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 5387#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. In addition, plaintiff is directed to serve on defendant a complete set of medical releases and authorizations together with the summons and complaint. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/29/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Qatar Airways Q.C.S.C. (Neptune, Pierre)
September 28, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Qatar Airways Q.C.S.C. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14881344 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Vinod Lall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Applebaum, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lall v. Qatar Airways Q.C.S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinod Lall
Represented By: Erin R. Applebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qatar Airways Q.C.S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?