Santos v. Dialysis Clinic, Inc.
Plaintiff: Patrick Santos
Defendant: Dialysis Clinic, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05431
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on December 7, 2021 @ 10:15 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE.Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by 3:00 p.m. on December 3, 2021. *** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833. If the parties are initially unable to connect to the call, please try again as the third-party conference call system has been overloaded at times. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/15/2021. (LK)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dialysis Clinic, Inc. (Garrett, Tim)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dialysis Clinic, Inc.. (Garrett, Tim)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION by Dialysis Clinic, Inc. (Garrett, Tim)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER [DE #7] is so ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/9/2021. (LK)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15008960. by Dialysis Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice) (Garrett, Tim)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15008665. by Dialysis Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice) (Pirtle, Mary Leigh)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. lso, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/8/2021. (LK)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/8/2021. (LK)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dialysis Clinic, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dialysis Clinic, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14888818 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Patrick Santos. (Rozger, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/30/2021) (Bowens, Priscilla).
September 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Dialysis Clinic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Santos
Represented By: Jason J. Rozger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dialysis Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Leigh Pirtle
Represented By: Tim K. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?