Zurich American Insurance Company et al v. Caddell Drydock And Repair Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, P.A., AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Starnet Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company and Underwriters at Lloyds of London
Defendant: Caddell Drydock And Repair Co., Inc. and Schottel, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05452
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Caddell Drydock And Repair Co., Inc., Schottel, Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Caddell Drydock And Repair Co., Inc., Schottel, Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Certificate of Default by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, P.A., Starnet Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Zurich American Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Request for Default, #2 Proposed Order Noting Default of Caddell Drydock And Repair Co., #3 Proposed Order Noting Default of Schottel, Inc.) (Fennell, William)
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 Letter regarding factual, jurisdictional, and legal basis for the claim(s) in advance of Initial Scheduling Conference by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, P.A., Starnet Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Zurich American Insurance Company (Fennell, William)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #10 . The Initial Status Conference scheduled for 11/17/2021 is adjourned without date. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to request entry of default from the Clerk by 11/19/2021, and to move for default judgment, including detailed proof of damages, within 14 days after the Clerk enters the default. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/12/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint via Secretary of State served on Caddell Drydock and Repair Co., Inc. on 10/21/2021, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Fennell, William)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Schottel Inc.,c/o The Corporation Trust Company on 10/4/2021, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Fennell, William)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 11/17/2021 at 10:00 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 5452#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/1/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry L. Stoltz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Stoltz, Terry)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Caddell Drydock And Repair Co., Inc., Schottel, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 1, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, P.A., Starnet Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Zurich American Insurance Company (Fennell, William)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caddell Drydock And Repair Co., Inc., Schottel, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14891304 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Underwriters at Lloyds of London, AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Starnet Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Zurich American Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Fennell, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company et al v. Caddell Drydock And Repair Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: William M. Fennell
Represented By: Terry L. Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, P.A.
Represented By: William M. Fennell
Represented By: Terry L. Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGCS Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: William M. Fennell
Represented By: Terry L. Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: William M. Fennell
Represented By: Terry L. Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starnet Insurance Company
Represented By: William M. Fennell
Represented By: Terry L. Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: William M. Fennell
Represented By: Terry L. Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Underwriters at Lloyds of London
Represented By: William M. Fennell
Represented By: Terry L. Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddell Drydock And Repair Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schottel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?