Great Normandy LLC v. 4 Queens Homes Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Great Normandy LLC
Defendant: 4 Queens Homes Inc. and Bolivar Canarte
Case Number: 1:2021cv05615
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Normandy LLC. Bolivar Canarte served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (Weinreb, Alan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 Letter advising of Defendant's executed COVID Hardship Declaration and stay until 1/15/22 as a result thereof by Great Normandy LLC (Attachments: #1 Defendant's COVID Hardship Declaration) (Weinreb, Alan)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Normandy LLC. 4 Queens Homes Inc. served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. (Weinreb, Alan)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Normandy LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Great Normandy LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinreb, Alan)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 4 Queens Homes Inc., Bolivar Canarte filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14915702 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Great Normandy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit F) (Weinreb, Alan)
October 8, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Normandy LLC v. 4 Queens Homes Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Normandy LLC
Represented By: Alan H Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4 Queens Homes Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolivar Canarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?