Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) LTD v. 501 Lafayette Ave LLC et. al.
Plaintiff: Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) LTD
Defendant: 501 Lafayette Ave LLC and Shanita Jones
Case Number: 1:2021cv05844
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Taryn A Merkl
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are respectfully directed to file a Status Report on or before 1/7/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 11/22/2021. (Cahn, Gabriel)
November 11, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) LTD. 501 Lafayette Ave LLC served on 10/28/2021, answer due 11/18/2021. (Weinreb, Alan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to 501 Lafayette Ave LLC, Shanita Jones. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) LTD (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinreb, Alan)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) LTD (Weinreb, Alan)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 501 Lafayette Ave LLC, Shanita Jones filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14950929 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes,, filed by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit F) (Weinreb, Alan) Modified on 10/21/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) LTD v. 501 Lafayette Ave LLC et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) LTD
Represented By: Alan H Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 501 Lafayette Ave LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanita Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?