Paloma v. Lasership et al
Plaintiff: Miriahm Paloma
Defendant: Lasership and Israel Luciano
Case Number: 1:2021cv06041
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James R Cho
Referring Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court finds that the financial declarations do not support a showing of indigency, and thus the application to proceed IFP is denied. Should the plaintiff wish to proceed with this lawsuit, she is directed to pay the $402 fee to the Clerk of Court of the Eastern District of New York within 14 days from the date of this order. If she fails to submit the filing fee within the time allowed, or to present evidence of indigency, the action will be dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is requested to send a copy of this order to the plaintiff, along with a Long Form IFP application and a Title VII complaint form. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 12/5/2021. (Greene, Donna)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Miriahm Paloma. (Guzzi, Roseann)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. I deem the declaration incomplete. The plaintiff can submit additional financial information to show that she cannot pay the filing fee. Within 14 days of the entry of this Order, the plaintiff must file a Long Form IFP application to proceed without prepayment of fees, or pay the $402 filing fee to proceed with this action. The plaintiff must submit a separate Long Form application for each civil action. The Clerk of Court shall send a Long Form IFP application to the plaintiff along with this Order. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 11/8/2021. (Greene, Donna)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Miriahm Paloma. (Neptune, Pierre)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lasership, Israel Luciano Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Miriahm Paloma. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paloma v. Lasership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriahm Paloma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lasership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?