Jimenez v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Juan J Jimenez
Defendant: The City of New York, Hugh Bogle, Derby Wanccique, Pascale Denis, Vivene Simpson, Glory Okezie and Dermot F. Shea
Case Number: 1:2021cv06133
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James R Cho
Referring Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Dermot F. Shea, The City of New York. (McGuire, Caroline)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Dermot F. Shea and The City of New York shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by 2/14/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/15/2021. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
December 8, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan J Jimenez. Dermot F. Shea served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (Sanders, Eric)
December 7, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Dermot F. Shea. (Herrera, Isaiah)
December 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline McGuire on behalf of The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (McGuire, Caroline)
December 6, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Summons. Re #15 Amended Complaint by Juan J Jimenez (Sanders, Eric)
December 6, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dermot F. Shea, filed by Juan J Jimenez. (Sanders, Eric)
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan J Jimenez. Derby Wanccique served on 11/30/2021, answer due 12/21/2021. (Sanders, Eric)
November 30, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan J Jimenez. Glory Okezie served on 11/30/2021, answer due 12/21/2021. (Sanders, Eric)
November 30, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan J Jimenez. Vivene Simpson served on 11/30/2021, answer due 12/21/2021. (Sanders, Eric)
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan J Jimenez. Pascale Denis served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Sanders, Eric)
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan J Jimenez. Hugh Bogle served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Sanders, Eric)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan J Jimenez. The City of New York served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Sanders, Eric)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Hugh Bogle, Pascale Denis, Glory Okezie, Vivene Simpson, Derby Wanccique. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Summons Issued, #4 Summons Issued) (Tavarez, Jennifer)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Hugh Bogle, Pascale Denis, Glory Okezie, Vivene Simpson, The City of New York, Derby Wanccique. (Herrera, Isaiah)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Juan J Jimenez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Hugh Bogle, #2 Proposed Summons Derby Wanccique, #3 Proposed Summons Pascale Denis, #4 Proposed Summons Vivene Simpson, #5 Proposed Summons Glory Okezie) (Sanders, Eric)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Juan J Jimenez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Hugh Bogle, #2 Proposed Summons Derby Wanccique, #3 Proposed Summons Pascale Denis, #4 Proposed Summons Vivene Simpson, #5 Proposed Summons Glory Okezie) (Sanders, Eric)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Juan J Jimenez (Sanders, Eric)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hugh Bogle, Pascale Denis, Glory Okezie, Vivene Simpson, The City of New York, Derby Wanccique filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14997498 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Juan J Jimenez. (Sanders, Eric)
November 3, 2021 Your proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: If multiple defendants, there must be a Rider with a list of all names and addresses of defendants attached to the summons. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan J Jimenez
Represented By: Eric Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Caroline McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Bogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derby Wanccique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pascale Denis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivene Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glory Okezie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermot F. Shea
Represented By: Caroline McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?