Napoleon v. Jaddou et al
Plaintiff: Ms. MARIE YVENANTE NAPOLEON
Respondent: Director USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou, NY District Dir Thomas Cioppa and US Attorney General Merrick Garland
Case Number: 1:2021cv06136
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by 60 days, as to why a writ of mandamus should not issue, and to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint from January 4, 2022 to March 4, 2022, and for a concomitant extension of the remaining deadlines set by the Court in the Order to Show Cause dated November 8, 2021, as set forth herein by Thomas Cioppa, Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou. (Yim, Kevin)
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Yim on behalf of Thomas Cioppa, Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou (aty to be noticed) (Yim, Kevin)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The United States Attorney, as attorney for Defendants, is directed to show cause on or before January 4, 2022 , in writing, why a #1 Writ of Mandamus should not be issued, and shall serve a copy of the response on Plaintiff, with proof of such service to the Clerk of this Court. On or before February 3, 2022, Plaintiff shall file a reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of this Court. Oral argument shall be heard on March 7, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. via teleconference before Judge Diane Gujarati. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839 and the access code is 2643682. The Parties should call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office. If any party has difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Gujarati_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Judge Diane Gujarati on 11/8/2021. *** Electronic Service upon the U.S. Attorney's Office re: this Order to Show Cause and Plaintiff's #1 Complaint / Writ of Mandamus.*** (Almonte, Kelly)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Thomas Cioppa, Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Marie Yvenante Napoleon (Gehi, Naresh)
November 4, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14998416 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by MARIE YVENANTE NAPOLEON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E) (Gehi, Naresh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Napoleon v. Jaddou et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. MARIE YVENANTE NAPOLEON
Represented By: Naresh M. Gehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Kevin Yim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NY District Dir Thomas Cioppa
Represented By: Kevin Yim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Attorney General Merrick Garland
Represented By: Kevin Yim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?