Chen v. Cioppa et al
Plaintiff: Xuekai Chen
Defendant: District Director Thomas Cioppa, USCIS Director Ur M. Jaddou and Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 1:2021cv06368
Filed: November 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dara A Olds on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Olds, Dara)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xuekai Chen. Thomas Cioppa served on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022; Ur M. Jaddou served on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Li, Ling)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Thomas Cioppa, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Xuekai Chen against Thomas Cioppa, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15036384 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Xuekai Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Li, Ling)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Cioppa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuekai Chen
Represented By: Ling Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Thomas Cioppa
Represented By: Dara A Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Director Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By: Dara A Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Dara A Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?