Ashmeade v. The City of New York City et al
Plaintiff: Damian Ashmeade
Defendant: The City of New York City, Michael O'Sullivan and NYPD Officers John Doe # 1-5
Case Number: 1:2021cv06375
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Adjourn Conference (February 4, 2022 Initial Conference) by Michael O'Sullivan, The City of New York City. (Pellegrino, Nicolette)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolette Pellegrino on behalf of Michael O'Sullivan (aty to be noticed) (Pellegrino, Nicolette)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to adjourn #9 is hereby denied. In light of the presence of multiple counsel appearing for Plaintiff, the conflict of one lawyer is insufficient to warrant adjournment of the initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/17/2021. (Bruckner, Ian)
December 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Adjourn Conference until the afternoon of either February 7 or February 8, 2022. by Damian Ashmeade. (Cocuzza, Francesca)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held at 2:00 P.M. on 2/04/2022 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 2/04/2022. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephonic initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/13/2021. (Manson, Eddie)
December 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for an extension of time to answer #7 is hereby granted. The deadline for defendants the City of New York and Michael O'Sullivan to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 2/7/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/5/2021. (Bruckner, Ian)
December 3, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by The City of New York City. (Pellegrino, Nicolette)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolette Pellegrino on behalf of The City of New York City (aty to be noticed) (Pellegrino, Nicolette)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Damian Ashmeade. Michael O'Sullivan served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Cocuzza, Francesca)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Damian Ashmeade. The City of New York City served on 11/18/2021, answer due 12/9/2021. (Cocuzza, Francesca)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael O'Sullivan, The City of New York City. (Attachments: #1 Sullivan summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Francesca G. Cocuzza on behalf of Damian Ashmeade (aty to be noticed) (Cocuzza, Francesca)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15037301 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Damian Ashmeade. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons on the City of New York, #3 Proposed Summons on NYPD Officer Michael O'Sullivan) (Celli, Andrew)
November 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashmeade v. The City of New York City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Ashmeade
Represented By: Francesca G. Cocuzza
Represented By: Andrew G. Celli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York City
Represented By: Nicolette Pellegrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O'Sullivan
Represented By: Nicolette Pellegrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officers John Doe # 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?