Dunston v. 177 5th Ave. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Natosha Dunston
Defendant: 177 5th Ave. LLC and DMPH Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06401
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant DMPH Inc. ("DMPH") requests an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint. ECF No. 8. As plaintiff consents, the request is granted. Defendant DMPH shall respond to the complaint by February 25, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/27/2021. (Wilhelm, Samantha)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DMPH Inc.. (Li, William)
December 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William Kaining Li on behalf of DMPH Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Li, William)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 DMPH summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Natosha Dunston (Barducci, Maria)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Natosha Dunston (Barducci, Maria)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 177 5th Ave. LLC, DMPH Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15041006 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Natosha Dunston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barducci, Maria)
November 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunston v. 177 5th Ave. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natosha Dunston
Represented By: Maria Constanza Barducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 177 5th Ave. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMPH Inc.
Represented By: William Kaining Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?