Lopez v. South Nassau Communities Hospital, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ms. Lisa Lopez
Defendant: South Nassau Communities Hospital, Inc. doing business as Mount Sinai South Nassau
Case Number: 1:2021cv06457
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert M Levy
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa Lopez. South Nassau Communities Hospital, Inc. waiver sent on 12/3/2021, answer due 2/1/2022. (Ehrlich, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Ehrlich on behalf of Lisa Lopez (notification declined or already on case) (Ehrlich, David)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to South Nassau Communities Hospital, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Lopez (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against South Nassau Communities Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Mount Sinai South Nassau filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15047634 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Lisa Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ehrlich, David)
November 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. South Nassau Communities Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Lisa Lopez
Represented By: David R. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Nassau Communities Hospital, Inc. doing business as Mount Sinai South Nassau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?