AMCM Glove LLC v. iConn Inc.
Plaintiff: AMCM Glove LLC
Defendant: iConn Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06863
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James R Cho
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Telephonic Settlement Conference previously scheduled for 2/10/2022 is adjourned to 2/23/2022 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. The parties are directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 1065334. The deadline to submit ex parte letters is extended to 2/16/2022, which may be forwarded by ex parte email to Cho_chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov (note that there is an underlined space between cho and chambers). Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/27/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
January 26, 2022 Filing 11 Letter re Settlement Conference by iConn Inc. (Amin, Ismail) Modified to add motion on 1/27/2022 (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia).
January 25, 2022 Filing 10 Letter Joint Status by iConn Inc. (Amin, Ismail)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic Settlement Conference will be held on 2/10/2022 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. The parties are directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 1065334. The parties are directed to submit ex parte settlement letters by 2/3/2022, which may be forwarded by ex parte email to my chambers at cho_chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov (note that there is an underlined space between cho and chambers). The ex parte settlement letters shall state (1) the status of settlement discussions; (2) the last demand and offer made, if any; (3) the strengths and weakness of their case; and (4) any information that may assist the Court in helping the parties resolve the matter. The parties are encouraged to discuss settlement prior to submission of the ex parte letters. The ex parte letters shall be limited to five pages exclusive of attachments. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/25/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: re #10 Letter filed by iConn Inc. The court approves the parties' proposed briefing schedule. Defendant shall serve its motion by February 14, 2022. Plaintiff shall serve its opposition by March 7, 2022. Defendant shall serve its reply by March 21, 2022, and on that date the parties shall file the complete set of motion papers in a logical order on ECF. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 1/25/2022. (Duhaime, Daniel)
January 18, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against iConn Inc., filed by AMCM Glove LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A. Purchase Order) (Dee, Peter)
January 11, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto: Pre Motion Conference held on 1/11/2022. Appearances: Peter Dee, Esq. for Plaintiff; Ismail Amin and Bradly Marks, Esqs. for Defendant. The court held a pre-motion conference regarding Defendant's proposed motion to dismiss the complaint based on lack of personal jurisdiction, improper venue, forum non conveniens, and failure to state a claim. Rather than proceed to motion practice at this time, Plaintiff will file an amended complaint by January 18, 2022. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to immediately ascertain the citizenship of his client's members, disclose this information to defense counsel, and plead this information in the amended complaint. The amended complaint should also plead additional facts to address the issues raised in Defendant's #5 letter. By January 25, 2022, the parties shall file a joint status letter reporting on their efforts to resolve this matter and advising the court whether they would like to be referred for a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Cho. The status letter should also advise the court whether Defendant intends to move to dismiss the amended complaint and, if so, should propose a mutually agreeable briefing schedule. (Court Reporter Andronikh Barna) (Duhaime, Daniel)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ismail Amin on behalf of iConn Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Amin, Ismail)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15179723. by iConn Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice) (Amin, Ismail)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ismail Amin shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/10/2022. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The parties shall appear telephonically for a pre-motion conference on January 11, 2022 at 2:00 PM. The parties shall dial into the conference by calling 1-888-684-8852 and entering the following access code: 1312089. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 12/23/2021. (Duhaime, Daniel)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 First MOTION for pre motion conference filed by AMCM Glove LLC. (Dee, Peter)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION for pre motion conference by iConn Inc.. (Marks, Bradly)
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ICONN INC. (Marks, Bradly)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ICONN INC. from Kings County Supreme Court, case number 528927/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15109299) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit A - Kings Supreme Complaint) (Marks, Bradly)
December 13, 2021 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMCM Glove LLC v. iConn Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMCM Glove LLC
Represented By: Peter Caro Dee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iConn Inc.
Represented By: Bradly Gurion Marks
Represented By: Bradly G. Marks
Represented By: Ismail Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?