Bussey v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Karel Bussey
Defendant: City of New York, Sgt Giacomo Pollari, PO Jerry Antoine, PO Davughn Clinton, PO Stanley Tse, PO Eric Lau, PO Jason Xia and PO Davaughn Clinton
Case Number: 1:2021cv07030
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Eric R Komitee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (McQueen, Matthew)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant, the City of New York, requests, with plaintiff's consent, an extension of time to answer the Complaint. ECF No. #24 . The request is granted. The City of New York shall answer plaintiff's Complaint by March 21, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/19/2022. (Yindra, Hannah)
January 18, 2022 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by City of New York. (McQueen, Matthew)
January 6, 2022 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karel Bussey. Davaughn Clinton served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Goldberg, Jay)
January 6, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karel Bussey. Jerry Antoine served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Goldberg, Jay)
January 6, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karel Bussey. Jason Xia served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Goldberg, Jay)
January 6, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karel Bussey. Stanley Tse served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Goldberg, Jay)
January 6, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karel Bussey. Giacomo Pollari served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Goldberg, Jay)
January 6, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karel Bussey. Eric Lau served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Goldberg, Jay)
January 6, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karel Bussey. Davaughn Clinton served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021. (Goldberg, Jay)
January 6, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karel Bussey. Jerry Antoine served on 1/4/2020, answer due 1/25/2020. (Goldberg, Jay)
December 29, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karel Bussey. (Goldberg, Jay)
December 29, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karel Bussey. City of New York served on 12/28/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Goldberg, Jay)
December 22, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Neptune, Pierre)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. by Karel Bussey (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Rider with defendants' names and addresses) (Goldberg, Jay)
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. by Karel Bussey (Goldberg, Jay)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by Karel Bussey (Goldberg, Jay)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by Karel Bussey (Goldberg, Jay)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Karel Bussey (Goldberg, Jay)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Karel Bussey (Goldberg, Jay)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Karel Bussey (Goldberg, Jay)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Karel Bussey (Goldberg, Jay)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Karel Bussey (Goldberg, Jay)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15134299 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Karel Bussey. (Goldberg, Jay)
December 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)
December 21, 2021 Your proposed summons was not issued for the following reason: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider listing the names and addresses of all defendants attached to a single proposed summons. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bussey v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karel Bussey
Represented By: Jay K. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Matthew W McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Giacomo Pollari
Represented By: Matthew W McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PO Jerry Antoine
Represented By: Matthew W McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PO Davughn Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PO Stanley Tse
Represented By: Matthew W McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PO Eric Lau
Represented By: Matthew W McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PO Jason Xia
Represented By: Matthew W McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PO Davaughn Clinton
Represented By: Matthew W McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?