Duncan v. Hollywood Chairs
Plaintiff: Eugene Duncan
Defendant: Hollywood Chairs
Case Number: 1:2021cv07075
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marcia M Henry
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant has until 03/15/2022 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 2/14/2022. (Gans, Courtney)
February 11, 2022 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Hollywood Chairs. (DiPalma, Joseph)
February 11, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph James DiPalma on behalf of Hollywood Chairs (aty to be noticed) (DiPalma, Joseph)
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin L. O'Fallon on behalf of Hollywood Chairs (aty to be noticed) (O'Fallon, Caitlin)
February 9, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugene Duncan. (Marks, Bradly)
January 27, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugene Duncan. Hollywood Chairs served on 1/25/2022, answer due 2/15/2022. (Marks, Bradly)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hollywood Chairs. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hollywood Chairs filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15139102 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Eugene Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Marks, Bradly)
December 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. Hollywood Chairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Duncan
Represented By: Bradly Gurion Marks
Represented By: Bradly G. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollywood Chairs
Represented By: Joseph James DiPalma
Represented By: Caitlin L. O'Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?