Ware v. United States of America et al
Petitioner: Ulysses T. Ware
Respondent: United States of America, Merrick B. Garland, Edgardo Ramos and Laura Taylor-Swain
Case Number: 1:2022cv01531
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:22-cv-03409, filed 04/27/2022. (Lee, Tiffeny)
April 21, 2022 Case transferred to District of Southern District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent via CM/ECF. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Lee, Tiffeny)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum and order, the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York for further consideration. The seven-day delay required under Local Rule 83.1 is waived, and, upon the transfer of the case, the Clerk of Court is to mark this case closed. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 4/21/2022. (Williams, Erica)
April 10, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Actual Innocent Supplemental Claim: #15 filed by Petitioner Ulysses T. Ware. (pgs. 1-82) (Layne, Monique)
April 10, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Actual Innocent Supplemental Claim #15 filed by Petitioner Ulysses T. Ware. (Layne, Monique)
April 8, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE "re Confirmation of Service of Complaint of Criminal Judicial Misconduct" filed by Ulysses T. Ware, dated 4/8/2022. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
April 7, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE to Hon. Roslynn R. Mauskopf entitled "Urgent 'Re: High crimes and misdemeanors of District Judge (EDNY)' " filed by pro se Ulysses T. Ware, dated 4/7/2022. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
April 6, 2022 Filing 14 "Petitioner's EXHIBIT # 55, re: Alpha Capital, AG (Anstalt) International Hobbs Act Extortion, Racketeering, Money Laundering and Loan Sharking Continuing Criminal Enterprise Article" filed by pro se Ulysses T. Ware, dated 4/5/2022. (File stamped on 4/5/2022.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
April 6, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE entitled "Urgent: Order To Show Cause Delivery to District Judge Hall, "for the government to Show Cause why the relief requested in the attached 4.06.22 Letter Brief shall not be granted." (Layne, Monique)
April 5, 2022 Filing 12 "Petitioner's EXHIBIT # 51: re Yale Law School's clinic application for 28 USC 2243 show cause order, Dkt. 3, and Order to Show Cause, Dkt. 8, entered in Terwilliger v. Cook, et al., 2241 habeas corpus proceeding" filed by pro se Ulysses T. Ware. (Two copies of Exhibit # 51 submitted.) W/Attachments: #1 "Petitioner's Exhibit # 52: re Group Management Corp. [...]" (part I), #2 "Petitioner's Exhibit # 52: re Group Management Corp. [...]" (part II). (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
April 3, 2022 Filing 11 EXHIBIT # 46: SEC Release 33-7190 n. 17 (1995)" filed by pro se Ulysses T. Ware. W/Attachments: #1 "Petitioner's Exhibit # 48, re: March 24, 2022, First Inquiry # 1.0 to AUSA [...]", #2 "Petitioner's Exhibit # 49: March 28, 2022, Linked-In article of NY lawyer Rachel E. Jackson, Esq. [...]", #3 "Petitioner's Exhibit # 53: re: Group Management Corp., 2003 motion i[...]", #4 "Petitioner's Exhibit # 54 [...]" (part I), #5 "Petitioner's Exhibit # 54 [...]" (part II). (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
March 31, 2022 Filing 10 Letter MOTION to Intervene entitled "28 USC 2243 (show cause order); Dkt. 1, Exhibits 2 and 3 (Brady Court Orders); and Article III subject matter jurisdiction and standing of the Government" filed by pro se Ulysses T. Ware, dated 3/31/2022. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
March 29, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: "Petitioner's Exhibit # 50: March 29, 2022, Second Inquiry #2.0" served electronically upon the United States Attorney (EDNY) and AUSA Nina C. Gupta on 3/29/2022; filed by pro se Ulysses T. Ware, dated 3/29/2022. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
March 26, 2022 Filing 8 "Petitioner's Application for entry of the 28 USC 2243 show cause order and Exhibit # 48" filed by Ulysses T. Ware, dated 3/26/2022. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
March 26, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service, re: "EXHIBIT 46: SEC Release 33-7190 n. 17 (1995)" served electronically upon the United States Attorney (EDNY) and AUSA Nina C. Gupta on 3/26/2022; filed by pro se Ulysses T. Ware, dated 3/26/2022. Modified.
March 25, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Petitioner's #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus served upon the United States Attorney's Office - EDNY (breon.peace@usdoj.gov) on 3/22/2022; filed by pro se Ulysses T. Ware. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nina C. Gupta on behalf of United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Gupta, Nina)
March 23, 2022 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Layne, Monique)
March 21, 2022 Filing 4 FILING FEE: $ 5.00, receipt number 4653163937 (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification by Ulysses T. Ware (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Ulysses T. Ware. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Petition, #3 Appendix 4, #4 Appendix 7, #5 Appendix 8, #6 AIS Claim 22, #7 Memorandum in Support) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2022: #8 Entry of Appearance) (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ware v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ulysses T. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Nina C. Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick B. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edgardo Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Laura Taylor-Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?