KeyBank National Association v. Nour Limo, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: KeyBank National Association, successor by merger to Key Equipment Finance Inc. and KeyBank National Association
Defendant: Nour Limo, Inc., Ragaey Mohamed and Ashraf Saad
Case Number: 1:2022cv01894
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KeyBank National Association. Ashraf Saad served on 4/20/2022, answer due 5/11/2022. (Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Mohamed summons, #2 Saad summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 4, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,,, by KeyBank National Association, successor by merger to Key Equipment Finance Inc. (Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ragaey Mohamed, Nour Limo, Inc., Ashraf Saad filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15438879 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by KeyBank National Association, successor by merger to Key Equipment Finance Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to Nour Limo, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons as to Ragey Mohamed, #4 Proposed Summons as Ashraf Saad, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P) (Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KeyBank National Association v. Nour Limo, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KeyBank National Association, successor by merger to Key Equipment Finance Inc.
Represented By: Dafney Dubuisson Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KeyBank National Association
Represented By: Dafney Dubuisson Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nour Limo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ragaey Mohamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashraf Saad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?