Sonn v. Getty et al
Plaintiff: Marlena Sonn
Defendant: Kendalle P. Getty, KPG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty, ASG Investments Inc., Minerva Office Management, Inc. and Robert L Leberman
Case Number: 1:2022cv02758
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. The stipulation #13 to transfer venue is so-ordered for the convenience of the parties and witnesses and in the interest of justice. See attached document. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. The provision of Rule 83.1 of the Local Rules of the Eastern District of New York, which requires a seven-day stay of an order transferring venue, is waived in light of the parties' stipulation to the transfer of venue. Upon the transfer of the case, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mark this case as closed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/8/2022. (Lozar, Ryan)
July 6, 2022 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 29, 2022, before Judge Scanlon. Court Transcriber: ARIA SERVICES, INC. Email address: aria@leinen.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 7/27/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2022. (Rocco, Christine)
June 29, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa E. Cleary on behalf of Kendalle P. Getty, KPG Investments Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Cleary, Lisa)
June 29, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon: Telephone Conference held on 6/29/2022. Agatha M Cole joined by Legal Analyst Julia Huesa appearing for Plaintiff. Lisa Cleary and Hannah Brudney appearing for Defendants Kendalle P. Getty and KPG Investments Inc. Matthew Aibel appearing for Defendants Alexandra Sarah Getty and ASG Investments Inc. Mark Gunderson appearing for Defendant Minerva Office Management, Inc. and Robert L Leberman. See separate docket entry for conference Order. (FTR Log #2:02 - 2:26.) (Dessources, Jose)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER. The Court heard argument on the Joint Motion to transfer this action to the District of Nevada. The Court will review the submissions and the transcript of today's proceeding and issue a decision. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/29/2022. (Dessources, Jose)
June 22, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Gunderson on behalf of Minerva Office Management, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Gunderson, Mark)
June 22, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin K Sweet on behalf of Minerva Office Management, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Sweet, Austin)
June 22, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Savage Aibel on behalf of ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty (notification declined or already on case) (Aibel, Matthew)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/22/2022. (Lozar, Ryan)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/22/2022. (Lozar, Ryan)
June 21, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support / Joint Submission in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by Consent of All Parties filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cole, Agatha)
June 21, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark H. Gunderson, Esq. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15677941. by Minerva Office Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Gunderson, Mark)
June 21, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Austin K. Sweet, Esq. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15677906. by Minerva Office Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Sweet, Austin)
June 15, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Slarskey on behalf of Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Slarskey, David)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting consent motion #14 to adjourn Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond sine die pending the Court's resolution of the transfer motion. A Telephone Conference is set for 6/29/2022 at 2:00 PM. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. On or before 6/21/2022, the parties will file a joint submission clearly addressing factors pertinent to an analysis of the motion #13 to change venue including, inter alia, (1) the plaintiff's choice of forum, (2) the convenience of witnesses, (3) the location of relevant documents and relative ease of access to sources of proof, (4) the convenience of parties, (5) the locus of operative facts, (6) the availability of process to compel the attendance of unwilling witnesses, and (7) the relative means of the parties. See Gottlieb v. U.S. Secs. Exch. Comm'n, 723 F. Appx 17, 19 (2d Cir. 2018). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/9/2022. (Lozar, Ryan)
June 7, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on behalf of all defendants by ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty. (Aibel, Matthew)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Per Judge Kovner's Individual Rule III, stipulations transferring venue are automatically referred to the assigned magistrate judge. Accordingly, the parties' consent motion #13 is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Scanlon for management in accordance with her individual rules. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 6/3/2022. Motions referred to Vera M. Scanlon. (Daus, Benjamin)
June 2, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Change Venue / Proposed Stipulation and Order to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Marlena Sonn. (Cole, Agatha)
May 27, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marlena Sonn. Kendalle P. Getty served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/9/2022. (Cole, Agatha)
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marlena Sonn. KPG Investments Inc. served on 5/18/2022, answer due 6/8/2022. (Cole, Agatha)
May 27, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marlena Sonn. Robert L Leberman served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. (Cole, Agatha)
May 27, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marlena Sonn. ASG Investments Inc. served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. (Cole, Agatha)
May 27, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marlena Sonn. Alexandra Sarah Getty served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. (Cole, Agatha)
May 27, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marlena Sonn. Minerva Office Management, Inc. served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Cole, Agatha)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: A Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 9/15/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 8/30/2022. In the event that any Defendant(s) has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiff(s) must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address(es) for such Defendant(s) and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/13/2022. (Lozar, Ryan)
May 12, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ASG Investments Inc., Alexandra Sarah Getty, Kendalle P. Getty, KPG Investments Inc., Robert L Leberman, Minerva Office Management, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 12, 2022 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 12, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 12, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Max Ephraim Rodriguez on behalf of Marlena Sonn (aty to be noticed) (Rodriguez, Max)
May 12, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15557979 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Marlena Sonn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Cole, Agatha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonn v. Getty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlena Sonn
Represented By: Agatha M Cole
Represented By: Max Ephraim Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendalle P. Getty
Represented By: Lisa E. Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPG Investments Inc.
Represented By: Lisa E. Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Sarah Getty
Represented By: Matthew Savage Aibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASG Investments Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Savage Aibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minerva Office Management, Inc.
Represented By: David Slarskey
Represented By: Austin K Sweet
Represented By: Mark Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Leberman
Represented By: David Slarskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?