Roberts v. Richard Beavers Gallery et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Roberts
Defendant: Richard Beavers Gallery, Richard Beavers and Lynthia Edwards
Case Number: 1:2022cv04516
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Taryn A Merkl
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2022 Filing 15 Letter responding to Defendants' pre-motion conference request by Deborah Roberts (Clarida, Robert)
September 26, 2022 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Richard Beavers, Lynthia Edwards, Richard Beavers Gallery, filed by Deborah Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Clarida, Robert)
September 22, 2022 Filing 13 Letter addressed to the Honorable LaShann DeArcy Hall for pre-motion conference on motion to dismiss by Richard Beavers, Lynthia Edwards, Richard Beavers Gallery (Nikas, Luke)
September 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Maaren Shah on behalf of Richard Beavers, Lynthia Edwards, Richard Beavers Gallery (aty to be noticed) (Shah, Maaren)
September 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke William Nikas on behalf of Richard Beavers, Lynthia Edwards, Richard Beavers Gallery (aty to be noticed) (Nikas, Luke)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #10 is hereby granted, on consent. Defendants are respectfully directed to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 9/26/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 8/24/2022. (Cahn, Gabriel)
August 23, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Deborah Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer Complaint) (Van Benthysen, Brett)
August 3, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Richard Beavers, Lynthia Edwards, Richard Beavers Gallery. (Attachments: #1 Richard Beavers, #2 Lynthia Beavers) (Lee, Tiffeny)
August 2, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Deborah Roberts (Van Benthysen, Brett)
August 2, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Deborah Roberts (Van Benthysen, Brett)
August 2, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Deborah Roberts (Van Benthysen, Brett)
August 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Van Benthysen on behalf of Deborah Roberts (aty to be noticed) (Van Benthysen, Brett)
August 2, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 copyright registration) (Rocco, Christine)
August 2, 2022 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 2, 2022 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 2, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 2, 2022 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No name and address on the Plaintiffs attorney name and addresses section., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Beavers, Lynthia Edwards, Richard Beavers Gallery filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15802985 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Deborah Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9) (Clarida, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Richard Beavers Gallery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Roberts
Represented By: Robert William Clarida
Represented By: Brett Van Benthysen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Beavers Gallery
Represented By: Luke William Nikas
Represented By: Maaren Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Beavers
Represented By: Luke William Nikas
Represented By: Maaren Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynthia Edwards
Represented By: Luke William Nikas
Represented By: Maaren Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?