E.B. v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: E.B.
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc., Republic Airways, Inc. and Does 1-8
Case Number: 1:2022cv04815
Filed: August 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roanne L Mann
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Schiavo, Mary)
October 6, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Wegman on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Wegman, Paula)
October 6, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Wegman on behalf of Republic Airways, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Wegman, Paula)
October 6, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16011365. by Republic Airways, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Admission Information, #3 Admission Information) (Wegman, Paula)
October 6, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Schiavo on behalf of E.B. (aty to be noticed) (Schiavo, Mary)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/6/2022. (JP)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on October 19, 2022 @ 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE.Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by 2:00 p.m. on October 17, 2022. *** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833.If the parties are initially unable to connect to the call, please try again as the third-party conference call system has been overloaded at times.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/29/2022. (LK)
September 28, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Republic Airways, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Republic Airways Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Delta Air Lines, Inc., Corporate Parent United Airlines, Inc. for Republic Airways, Inc.. (Shearer, Douglas)
September 28, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group Inc. for American Airlines, Inc.. (Shearer, Douglas)
September 28, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Republic Airways, Inc.. (Shearer, Douglas)
September 28, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Airlines, Inc.. (Shearer, Douglas)
September 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Andrew Shearer on behalf of Republic Airways, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Shearer, Douglas)
September 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Andrew Shearer on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Shearer, Douglas)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/15/2022. (Proujansky, Josh)
September 14, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15938932. by E.B.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Admission Information Certificates of Good Standing) (Migliori, Donald)
August 30, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B.. Republic Airways, Inc. served on 8/24/2022, answer due 9/14/2022. (Migliori, Donald)
August 30, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.B.. American Airlines, Inc. served on 8/24/2022, answer due 9/14/2022. (Migliori, Donald)
August 17, 2022 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Airlines, Inc., Republic Airways, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Republic summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by E.B. (Migliori, Donald)
August 16, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15848985 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by E..... B...... (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons American Airlines, #3 Proposed Summons Republic Airways) (Migliori, Donald)
August 16, 2022 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.B. v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.B.
Represented By: Donald Alan Migliori
Represented By: Mary Schiavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Paula Wegman
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Shearer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Airways, Inc.
Represented By: Paula Wegman
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Shearer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?