Poor v. Starbucks Corporation
Petitioner: Teresa Poor
Respondent: Starbucks Corporation
Interested Party: Workers United, Justin Wooster, Joselyn Chuquillanqui and David Saff
Case Number: 1:2022cv07255
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James R Cho
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 1/27/2023 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearances by counsel for Petitioner National Labor Relations Board (Board); Starbucks Corporation (Respondent); Workers United and David Saff (collectively, Union); and Justin Wooster and Joselyn Chuquillanqui (collectively, Workers). Argument heard on letter motions to quash [53, 54]. The Court grants the request by the Union and Workers for full briefing on the anticipated motions to quash [53, 54], and otherwise denies the motions without prejudice as moot pending full briefing on the anticipated motions. The Court entered the following schedule:(1) By 1/30/2023, Respondent shall file a letter informing the parties whether it withdraws in part or otherwise modifies the at-issue subpoenas. (2) By 2/1/2023, the Board is granted leave to file an amended motion to quash. The Board shall file a status report if it does not anticipate filing an amended motion.(3) By 2/1/2023, the Union and Workers shall file their motion to quash.(4) By 2/8/2023, Respondent shall file its opposition to all pending motions to quash. (The previous deadline of 1/27/2023 for Respondent's opposition is adjourned.)(5) By 2/10/2023, the Union, Workers, and Board may file a reply in support of their motion to quash.The Union and Workers need not produce a privilege log at this time. The 2/3/2023 status conference is adjourned sine die.The Court extends the discovery deadline to 2/10/2023. (FTR Log #1:20-2:00.) (SG)
January 26, 2023 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #53 Letter MOTION to Quash , #54 Letter MOTION to Quash Starbucks' Subpoenas filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Hiller, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2023 Filing 54 Letter MOTION to Quash Starbucks' Subpoenas by Joselyn Chuquillanqui, Justin Wooster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Harris, Jessica)
January 25, 2023 Filing 53 Letter MOTION to Quash by David Saff, Workers United. (Gallo, Cristina)
January 24, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION for Discovery Cutoff Adjournment by Starbucks Corporation. (Mendelson, Jedd)
January 24, 2023 Filing 51 Letter - Joint Letter re Motion to Quash by Workers United, David Saff (Gallo, Cristina)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court reserves ruling on the proposed briefing schedule #51 with respect to the anticipated motion to quash Respondent's subpoenas.By 8 p.m. on Wednesday, January 25, 2023, counsel for Workers United and David Saff, and counsel for Joselyn Chuquillanqui and Justin Wooster shall each file a separate letter motion limited to 5 pages (not including exhibits) that sets forth the basis for their anticipated motion to quash or for a protective order in connection with Respondent's subpoenas; by 8 p.m. on Thursday, January 26, 2023, Respondent shall file its letter response to the letter motions also limited to 5 pages (not including exhibits).Hearing on the letter motions scheduled for Friday, January 27, 2023 at 1:15 p.m. before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho in Courtroom 11D South. Attorneys should come prepared to argue the letter motions. The Court will decide at the hearing whether additional briefing is necessary.The Court will address the motion #52 to extend the discovery cutoff date at the January 27, 2023 hearing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/24/2023. (JRC)
January 23, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica E. Harris on behalf of Joselyn Chuquillanqui, Justin Wooster (aty to be noticed) (Harris, Jessica)
January 18, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Paster on behalf of Workers United (aty to be noticed) (Paster, Rachel)
January 18, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie Barnes Hahn on behalf of Workers United (aty to be noticed) (Hahn, Marie) Modified on 1/19/2023 (IH).
January 18, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina E. Gallo on behalf of Workers United (aty to be noticed) (Gallo, Cristina) Modified on 1/19/2023 (IH).
January 13, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION to Quash Attorney Affirmation in Support of Petitioner's Motion to Quash Subpoenas by Teresa Poor. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Petitioner's Motion to Quash Subpoenas, #2 Notice of Motion re Petitioner's Motion to Quash Subpoenas) (Jackson, Matthew)
January 13, 2023 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 5, 2023, before Judge Cho. Court Transcriber: Superior Reporting Services LLC. Email address: transcripts@superiorreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 2/3/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2023. (RC)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Protective Order [as modified by the Court]. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/12/2023. (SG)
January 12, 2023 Filing 43 Letter Regarding Non-Party Subpoenas Served on Justin Wooster and Joselyn Chuquillanqui by Justin Wooster, Joselyn Chuquillanqui (Harris, Jessica)
January 12, 2023 Filing 42 Letter to Court Re Forthcoming Objections Motion by Workers United (Harris, Jessica)
January 12, 2023 Filing 41 Letter Letter to Judge Cho regarding Third Party Subpoenas by Workers United (Gallo, Cristina)
January 12, 2023 Filing 40 Letter Joint Letter regarding Motion to Quash Subpoenas by Teresa Poor (Jackson, Matthew)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule #40 in connection with petitioner's anticipated motion to quash. Petitioner shall file its motion to quash by 1/13/2023, and respondent shall file its opposition by 1/27/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/12/2023. (SG)
January 11, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Stepp on behalf of Starbucks Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Stepp, Brittany)
January 11, 2023 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Kadela by Starbucks Corporation (Kadela, David)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brittany Stepp shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/11/2023. (SG)
January 10, 2023 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16286695. Notarized Affidavit by Starbucks Corporation (Stepp, Brittany)
January 9, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION for Protective Order by Starbucks Corporation. (Mendelson, Jedd)
January 9, 2023 NOTICE re Dkt. #35 Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Rule 1.3(c), an attorney seeking to be admitted pro hac vice must file an affidavit in support of their motion that is notarized. Counsel shall file a revised affidavit forthwith. (SG)
January 6, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16286695. by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Good Standing Certificates - BStepp, #3 Proposed Order) (Stepp, Brittany)
January 6, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Hiller on behalf of Starbucks Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Hiller, Jeffrey)
January 6, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Kadela on behalf of Starbucks Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Kadela, David)
January 6, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16283011. by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Ohio Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit North Carolina Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Georgia Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Exhibit Order) (Hiller, Jeffrey)
January 6, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16282972. by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Order) (Kadela, David)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #31 and #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys David A. Kadela and Jeffrey S. Hiller shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/6/2023. (SG)
January 5, 2023 MINUTE ENTRY for Discovery Conference proceedings held on 1/5/2023 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearances by Matthew A. Jackson for petitioner; Jedd Mendelson for respondent. Parties have been unable to reach an agreement on a proposed protective order and have submitted for the Court's review competing protective orders [28, 29]. Discussion regarding paragraph 4 of the parties' proposed protective orders. Findings made on the record. Parties have agreed to provide for an initial production of documents with the names of individuals redacted, unless that individual has previously self-identified his or her views on unionization. An unredacted set of documents shall be produced for attorneys' eyes only. If any party seeks to lift the attorneys' eyes only designation for certain documents (i.e., seek to unredact certain names), parties shall meet and confer first; if they are unable to resolve their dispute, parties may seek relief from the Court.For the reasons stated on the record, the Court denies the parties' motions [28, 29]. By 1/10/2023, parties shall file a revised joint proposed protective order. The Court does not require the parties to include "contempt of Court" language in the proposed order. Petitioner has requested that respondent produce any signed "Exhibit A" acknowledgment forms.For the reasons stated on the record, the Court grants respondent's unopposed motion to extend the discovery schedule. By 2/1/2023, parties shall complete all discovery, including depositions. The in-person status conference scheduled for 1/26/2023 is adjourned to 2/3/2023 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Parties should come prepared to confirm that they have completed discovery. (AT&T Conference Bridge.) (LS)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic conference scheduled for 1/5/2023 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. The parties are directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 106-5334. Parties should come prepared to discuss their respective proposed protective orders #28 #29 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/4/2023. (LS)
January 3, 2023 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 26, 2022, before Judge Cho. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcriptions Plus II, Inc. Email address: RL.Transcriptions2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2023. (LH)
December 29, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION for Protective Order Letter in Support of Protective Order with Exhibits by Starbucks Corporation. (Mendelson, Jedd)
December 29, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Protective Order Letter enclosing Petitioner's Proposed Protective Order by Teresa Poor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Protective Order) (Jackson, Matthew)
December 28, 2022 Filing 27 Letter re. Advancement of Protective Order by Starbucks Corporation (Mendelson, Jedd)
December 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for Discovery Conference proceedings held on 12/26/2022 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearances by Matthew A. Jackson for petitioner; Jedd Mendelson and Adam Paul Tuzzo for defendant. Argument heard on parties' proposed protective orders #26 . For the reasons stated on the record, parties shall raise objections as to confidentiality during depositions to preserve the record without any further discussion. Deponents should still answer the questions posed.The Court limits the recipients of confidential information to those that need to know within the supervisory chain with appropriate redaction of employee names as needed. Respondent is permitted to share confidential information with in-house attorneys. Respondent may also share confidential information with non-supervisory employees (with appropriate warnings).Parties shall submit a revised proposed protective order for the Court's review and approval by 12/28/2022.Discussion regarding production of "exculpatory" information limited to the issue before this Court. By 12/27/2022, petitioner shall serve (but not file) a letter confirming whether it has any "exculpatory" information. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/26/2022. (AT&T Conference Bridge) (JRC)
December 25, 2022 Filing 26 Letter Joint - Addressing Disputes re Protective Order by Starbucks Corporation (Mendelson, Jedd)
December 23, 2022 Filing 25 Letter re Submission of Protective Order by Starbucks Corporation (Mendelson, Jedd)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has received the parties' letters [24, 25] and voice message informing the Court that they are having difficulty reaching an agreement on a proposed protective order. The Court highly encourages the parties to renew efforts to reach an agreement on a protective order. If the parties still are unable to bridge their differences, parties shall submit a joint letter by 8:00 a.m. on December 26, 2022 that includes the latest draft proposed protective order and that identifies areas of disagreement.Telephone conference set for 9:30 a.m. on December 26, 2022 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. The parties are directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 106-5334. If the parties reach an agreement on a protective order, the Court will cancel the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/23/2022 (JRC).
December 22, 2022 Filing 24 Letter re Protective Order by Starbucks Corporation (Mendelson, Jedd)
December 22, 2022 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 19, 2022, before Judge Cho. Court Transcriber: Transcriptions Plus II, Inc.. Email address: RL.Transcriptions2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/12/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2023. (RC)
December 21, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Paul Tuzzo on behalf of Starbucks Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Tuzzo, Adam)
December 19, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam-Paul Tuzzo Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16241070. by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice) (Tuzzo, Adam)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Adam Paul Tuzzo shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/19/2022. (SG)
December 19, 2022 Minute Entry for Discovery Conference held on 12/19/2022 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearances by Matthew A. Jackson for petitioner; Jedd Mendelson for defendant. Case discussed. The Court entered the following expedited discovery schedule:(1) By 12/20/2022 , petitioner shall produce witness affidavits. The affidavits shall be subject to a protective order and for attorney's eyes only. (2) By 12/22/2022, parties shall submit a proposed protective order for the Court's review and approval.(3) By 12/23/2022, defendant shall serve subpoenas. Defendant anticipates requesting production of documents from approximately five individuals/former employees.(4) Defendant anticipates taking approximately five depositions of former employees and union representatives. Parties shall file a letter informing the Court as to the dates of scheduled depositions. Depositions limited to three hours per witness (not inclusive of breaks). Defendant granted leave to request additional time to depose union representatives, if necessary.(5) By 1/25/2023, parties shall complete all discovery, including depositions.(6) Parties may raise discovery disputes in a joint letter to the Court. The Court waives page limitations with respect to these discovery letters. If disputes arise during depositions, parties may contact Chambers directly. Parties shall otherwise follow Magistrate Judge Cho's Individual Rules as it relates to discovery disputes.In-person status conference scheduled for 1/26/2023 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Parties should come prepared to confirm that they have completed discovery. (FTR Log 10:21-10:58.) (LS)
December 15, 2022 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Allyne R. Ross: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/15/2022. On December 15, 2022, the court held a telephone call to hear argument on Petitioner Poor's motion to try the petition on the basis of the administrative record and Respondent Starbucks Corporation's motion for expedited discovery. As explained during the call, Petitioner Theresa Poor has not demonstrated that nationwide relief is warranted on the administrative record and the court will grant expedited discovery subject to the limitations that were enumerated on the record. A more comprehensive discovery order will be posted to the docket shortly. (Court Reporter Georgette Betts.) (RG)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled for December 15, 2022, at 12:00 p.m., before Judge Allyne R. Ross to discuss the Petitioner's motion to try the petition on the administrative record and the Respondent's motion for expedited discovery. Parties are directed to call 888-684-8852 and use access code # 3055199. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 12/15/2022. (VL) Modified on 1/10/2023 (RG). (Entered: 01/10/2023)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery hearing scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/15/2022. (LS)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: (1) As set forth in the record of the conference held before the Court on December 15, 2022, the Court has concluded that the Petitioner's requested nationwide injunctive relief is not warranted and any potential injunctive relief will be limited to the Great Neck store.(2) Petitioner has asked the Court to determine its petition for temporary injunctive relief on the basis of the administrative record. ECF No. #2 . The Court grants the motion in so far as it goes to the issue of reasonable cause and denies the motion in so far as it goes to the issue of the "just and proper" remedy.(3) In connection with Petitioner's request for temporary relief, Respondent has requested expedited discovery. ECF No. #12 . The Court denies the requested discovery in so far as it relates to the element of reasonable cause. It grants discovery as it relates to the equitable consideration of whether the injunctive relief sought by Petitioner, solely as to the Great Neck store, is just and proper.(4) The parties are referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Cho for oversight of expedited discovery, including the issuance of a protective order if found appropriate by Judge Cho. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 12/15/2022. (VL)
December 13, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY in Support OF RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Mendelson, Jedd)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Respondent may file a reply, if any, to the Petitioner's Response in Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Expedited Discovery by December 13, 2022, at 12:00 p.m. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 12/12/2022. (VL)
December 9, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY in Support Petitioner's Reply in Support of Motion to try Petition on the Basis of Administrative Record filed by Teresa Poor. (Jackson, Matthew)
December 8, 2022 Filing 16 EXHIBIT Declaration of Matthew A. Jackson re Filing Administrative Record by Teresa Poor. Related document: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion to Try Petition on Basis of Administrative Record filed by Teresa Poor. (Attachments: #1 GC Exhibit 1, #2 GC Exhibits 2-33, #3 GC Exhibits 34-46, #4 GC Exhibit 56, #5 Administrative Record GC Exhibit 60, #6 Administrative Record GC Exhibits 38-40, 55, 57-59, 61, and 63-66, #7 Administrative Record R Exhibits 6, 10, 11, 13, 16, 17, 24, 26, 31, 32, 37, 44, 45, 47, 48, and 53-55, #8 Administrative Record R Exhibit 57 (part 1 of 3), #9 Administrative Record R Exhibit 57 (part 2 of 3), #10 Administrative Record R Exhibit 57 (part 3 of 3), #11 Administrative Record R Exhibits 7, 12 and 14, #12 Administrative Record Rejected Exhibits) (Jackson, Matthew)
December 8, 2022 Filing 15 Letter from Jedd Mendelson re corrections and omissions by Starbucks Corporation (Mendelson, Jedd)
December 6, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Starbucks Corporation (Mendelson, Jedd)
December 6, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Starbucks Corporation. (Mendelson, Jedd)
December 6, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion to Try Petition on Basis of Administrative Record filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service) (Mendelson, Jedd)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Petitioner is directed to file a reply, if any, to the Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Try the Petition on the Basis of the Administrative Record #12 and a response to the Respondent's Motion for Expedited Discovery by December 9, 2022, at 4 p.m. Petitioner should also submit any outstanding exhibits relating to the administrative record by that time. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 12/6/2022. (VL)
December 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jedd Mendelson on behalf of Starbucks Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Mendelson, Jedd)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew A. Jackson shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/2/2022. (SG) Modified on 12/5/2022 (SG).
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE dated 12/1/22 directing respondent Starbucks Corporation as to why a temporary injunction should not issue. Show Cause Response/answer due by 12/6/2022. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 12/1/2022 ) (RG)
December 1, 2022 Filing 9 Letter Forwarding Updated Certificate of Good Standing for Matthew A. Jackson by Teresa Poor (Attachments: #1 Admission Information) (Jackson, Matthew)
December 1, 2022 NOTICE re Dkt. #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Rule 1.3, an attorney seeking to be admitted shall include a certificate of the clerk of the court for each of the states in which the applicant is a member of the bar, which has been issued within thirty (30) days of filing and states that the applicant is a member in good standing of the bar of that state court. Attorney Matthew A. Jackson is directed to submit an updated certificate of good standing using the ECF event "Letter" and link the document to the motion. (SG)
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Teresa Poor (Jackson, Matthew)
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
November 30, 2022 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
November 30, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Teresa Poor Service of Mtn to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Jackson, Matthew)
November 30, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teresa Poor. Starbucks Corporation served on 11/30/2022, answer due 12/21/2022. (Jackson, Matthew)
November 30, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew A. Jackson Filing fee $ 150. by Teresa Poor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice) (Jackson, Matthew)
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion to Try Petition on Basis of Administrative Record by Teresa Poor. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Hearing Trancript - Vol. 1, #2 Administrative Record Hearing Trancript - Vol. 2, #3 Administrative Record Hearing Trancript - Vol. 3, #4 Administrative Record Hearing Trancript - Vol. 4, #5 Administrative Record Hearing Trancript - Vol. 5, #6 Administrative Record Hearing Trancript - Vol. 6, #7 Administrative Record Hearing Trancript - Vol. 7, #8 Administrative Record Hearing Trancript - Vol. 8, #9 Administrative Record Hearing Trancript - Vol. 9) (Jackson, Matthew)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition for Temporary Injunction under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act against Starbucks Corporation Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Teresa Poor. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Teresa Poor in Support of Petition for Temporary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Temporary Injunction) (Jackson, Matthew)
November 30, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
November 30, 2022 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel Is Directed to File a Completed Civil Cover Sheet Immediately. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poor v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Teresa Poor
Represented By: Matthew A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Adam Paul Tuzzo
Represented By: Brittany L. Stepp
Represented By: David A. Kadela
Represented By: Jedd Mendelson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Workers United
Represented By: Cristina E. Gallo
Represented By: Marie Barnes Hahn
Represented By: Rachel S. Paster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Justin Wooster
Represented By: Jessica E. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Joselyn Chuquillanqui
Represented By: Jessica E. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: David Saff
Represented By: Cristina E. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?