United States of America v. The Real Property And Premises Known As 432 North Oakhurst Drive, Condominium Unit 103, Beverly Hills, California 90210, And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Real Property And Premises Known As 432 North Oakhurst Drive, Condominium Unit 103, Beverly Hills, California 90210, And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, The Real Property And Premises Known As 432 North Oakhurst Drive, Condominium Unit 203, Beverly Hills, California 90210, And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, Any And All Funds On Deposit In Stifel Nicolaus & Co. Account Number Ending In 9142, Held In The Name Of 7D Business Bureau Inc., And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto and Any And All Funds On Deposit In Citizens Business Bank Account Number Ending In 7135, Held In The Name Of 7D Business Bureau Inc., And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto
Claimant: 73DT Business Enterprises, LLC, 7D Business Bureau, Inc. and Yosef Manela
Case Number: 1:2022cv07410
Filed: December 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjay Bhandari on behalf of Yosef Manela (notification declined or already on case) (Bhandari, Sanjay)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Sanjay Bhandari is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of claimant Yosef Manela. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/1/2023. (RO)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice NOTICE OF MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16363249. by Yosef Manela. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Standing 1-25-2023 State Bar of California) (Bhandari, Sanjay)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America declaration of publication, legal notice was published on the official government website www.forfeiture.gov, beginning on December 24, 2022 and ending on January 22, 2023 (O'Connor, Madeline)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America direct notice sent to potential claimants on December 16, 2022 and January 6, 2023 (O'Connor, Madeline)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Claim and Answer --- As an initial matter, Claimant's extension request fails to comply with this Court's Individual Rules and Practices which require that requests for deadline extensions be made THREE business days prior to the date in question. See, Judge Irizarry's Individual Rules and Practices, Section II(D). However, the extension request is granted for the reasons set forth in the request. See, Ext. Req., Dkt. Entry No. #11 . Accordingly, the Notice of Claim shall be due February 21, 2023 and the Answer shall be due March 14, 2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 1/24/2023. (CC)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Claim and Answer by Yosef Manela. (Chang, Albert)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and File Notice of Claim by Claimants 73DT Business Enterprises, LLC and 7D Business Bureau, Inc. -- The Notice of Claim shall be due February 21, 2023 and the Answer shall be due March 14, 2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 1/19/2023. (Irizarry, Dora)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Notice of Claim by 73DT Business Enterprises, LLC, 7D Business Bureau, Inc.. (Poscablo, Ryan)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Paul Poscablo on behalf of 73DT Business Enterprises, LLC, 7D Business Bureau, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Poscablo, Ryan)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (O'Connor, Madeline)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (O'Connor, Madeline)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR ARREST OF ARTICLES IN REM: Motion for Issuance of Warrant #5 , is Granted. (See attached for details). Ordered by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/14/2022. (ML)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Letter MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem (Citizens Business Bank Account No. Ending in 7135), #2 Proposed Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem (Stifel Nicolaus and Co. Account No. Ending in 9142)) (O'Connor, Madeline) Modified on 12/14/2022 (CC).
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings. Judge Diane Gujarati no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/13/2022. (SR)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (O'Connor, Madeline)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Any And All Funds On Deposit In Citizens Business Bank Account Number Ending In 7135, Held In The Name Of 7D Business Bureau Inc., And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, Any And All Funds On Deposit In Stifel Nicolaus & Co. Account Number Ending In 9142, Held In The Name Of 7D Business Bureau Inc., And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, The Real Property And Premises Known As 432 North Oakhurst Drive, Condominium Unit 103, Beverly Hills, California 90210, And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto, The Real Property And Premises Known As 432 North Oakhurst Drive, Condominium Unit 203, Beverly Hills, California 90210, And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem (Citizens Business Bank Account No. Ending in 7135), #3 Proposed Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem (Stifel Nicolaus & Co. Account No. Ending in 9142)) (O'Connor, Madeline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The Real Property And Premises Known As 432 North Oakhurst Drive, Condominium Unit 103, Beverly Hills, California 90210, And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Madeline M. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Real Property And Premises Known As 432 North Oakhurst Drive, Condominium Unit 103, Beverly Hills, California 90210, And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Real Property And Premises Known As 432 North Oakhurst Drive, Condominium Unit 203, Beverly Hills, California 90210, And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any And All Funds On Deposit In Stifel Nicolaus & Co. Account Number Ending In 9142, Held In The Name Of 7D Business Bureau Inc., And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any And All Funds On Deposit In Citizens Business Bank Account Number Ending In 7135, Held In The Name Of 7D Business Bureau Inc., And All Proceeds Traceable Thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: 73DT Business Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Paul Poscablo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: 7D Business Bureau, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Paul Poscablo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Yosef Manela
Represented By: Sanjay Bhandari
Represented By: Albert Yong Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?